This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 07/17/2022 at 13:35:10 (UTC).

Cesar David Reyes vs. Kia America Inc

Case Summary

On 05/26/2022 Cesar David Reyes filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Kia America Inc. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0627

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Reyes, Cesar David

Soto, Arnulfo

Soto, Bertha Barrios de

Defendants

Does 1-200

Hyundai Mobis Co LTD

Hyundai-Kia America Technical Center Inc

Kia America Inc

Kia Motors Corporation

Mayorga, Edgar Sandoval

Wise Automotive Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael A Kelly

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/16/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/16/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Declaration - Other (Arnulfo Soto RE: Successor in interest to the estate of Thelma Soto Barrios) filed

Declaration - Other (Arnulfo Soto RE: Successor in interest to the estate of Thelma Soto Barrios) filed

Summons filed

Summons filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 38; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Reyes, Cesar(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed; Filed By: Reyes, Cesar(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Reyes, Cesar(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Reyes, Cesar(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Reyes, Cesar(Plaintiff); Soto, Arnulfo(Plaintiff); Soto, Bertha(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/16/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 05/27/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Declaration - Other (Arnulfo Soto RE: Successor in interest to the estate of Thelma Soto Barrios) filed; Filed By: Reyes, Cesar(Plaintiff); Soto, Arnulfo(Plaintiff); Soto, Bertha(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 38

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Reyes, Cesar(Plaintiff); Soto, Arnulfo(Plaintiff); Soto, Bertha(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Reyes, Cesar(Plaintiff); Soto, Arnulfo(Plaintiff); Soto, Bertha(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HYUNDAI MOBIS CO., LTD is a litigant

Latest cases where Kia America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Kia Motors America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KELLY MICHAEL ALBERT