This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 01/09/2023 at 02:48:03 (UTC).

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, subscribing to Policy Number ATR/MC/538190 vs. Buss Underwriters

Case Summary

On 07/05/2022 Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, subscribing to Policy Number ATR/MC/538190 filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against Buss Underwriters. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2870

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, subscribing to Policy Number ATR/MC/538190

Defendants

Does 1-100

Bass Underwriters

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John D Broghammer

Defendant Attorney

Timothy W Fredericks

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

Summons filed

Summons filed

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/24/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/24/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Answer filed

Answer filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 31; Status: Reassigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 43; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case reassigned to 43 effective 10/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/24/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Fredericks, Timothy W added as a effective 09/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer filed; Filed By: Bass Underwriters(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, subscribing to Policy Number ATR/MC/538190(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, subscribing to Policy Number ATR/MC/538190(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/24/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 07/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, subscribing to Policy Number ATR/MC/538190(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, subscribing to Policy Number ATR/MC/538190(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less