This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/19/2022 at 08:02:33 (UTC).

Cecilia Estrada Orozco vs. American Building Supply Inc, a California corporation

Case Summary

On 11/09/2021 Cecilia Estrada Orozco filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against American Building Supply Inc, a California corporation. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1058

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Estrada Orozco, Cecilia

Defendants

Aerotek Inc, a Maryland corporation

American Building Supply Inc, a California corporation

Does 1-25

Jeld-Wen, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel E Nomanim

Ken Boyd

Defendant Attorneys

Michael S Kun

Michael D Thomas

 

Court Documents

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Estrada Orozco, Cecilia(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed. (Filed By: Estrada Orozco, Cecilia(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Estrada Orozco, Cecilia(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Estrada Orozco, Cecilia(Plaintiff))

Answer (To Complaint) filed.

Answer (To Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Aerotek Inc, a Maryland corporation(Defendant))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Estrada Orozco, Cecilia(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Estrada Orozco, Cecilia(Plaintiff))

Ex Parte Application - Other (for an extension to File Pleadings in Response to Complaint) filed

Ex Parte Application - Other (for an extension to File Pleadings in Response to Complaint) filed

Declaration - Other (of Jack S Sholkoff ISO Application for Extension to File Pleadings) filed

Declaration - Other (of Jack S Sholkoff ISO Application for Extension to File Pleadings) filed

Declaration - Other (of Ryan T Chuman ISO Ex Parte Application for Extension to File Pleadings) filed

Declaration - Other (of Ryan T Chuman ISO Ex Parte Application for Extension to File Pleadings) filed

Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed

Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed

Order After Hearing filed

Order After Hearing filed

Answer submitted by Jeld-Wen, Inc rejected on 03/01/2022

Answer submitted by Jeld-Wen, Inc rejected on 03/01/2022

Stipulation Only - Other (to Arbitrate Claims and Stay Action) filed

Stipulation Only - Other (to Arbitrate Claims and Stay Action) filed

Proposed Order filed

Proposed Order filed

Substitution of Attorney filed

Substitution of Attorney filed

Order - Other (Granting Stipulation) filed

Order - Other (Granting Stipulation) filed

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Granting Stipulation) filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Thomas, Michael D added as a effective 03/09/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Substitution of Attorney filed; Filed By: Jeld-Wen, Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proposed Order filed; Filed By: Aerotek Inc, a Maryland corporation(Defendant); Estrada Orozco, Cecilia(Plaintiff); Jeld-Wen, Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Stipulation Only - Other (to Arbitrate Claims and Stay Action) filed; Filed By: Aerotek Inc, a Maryland corporation(Defendant); Estrada Orozco, Cecilia(Plaintiff); Jeld-Wen, Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer submitted by Jeld-Wen, Inc rejected on 03/01/2022; Filed By: Jeld-Wen, Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order After Hearing filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Declaration - Other (of Ryan T Chuman ISO Ex Parte Application for Extension to File Pleadings) filed; Filed By: Jeld-Wen, Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Declaration - Other (of Jack S Sholkoff ISO Application for Extension to File Pleadings) filed; Filed By: Jeld-Wen, Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Ex Parte Application - Other (for an extension to File Pleadings in Response to Complaint) filed; Filed By: Jeld-Wen, Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Sholkoff, Jack S added as a effective 01/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer (To Complaint) filed; Filed By: Aerotek Inc, a Maryland corporation(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Estrada Orozco, Cecilia(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Estrada Orozco, Cecilia(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Estrada Orozco, Cecilia(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed; Filed By: Estrada Orozco, Cecilia(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Estrada Orozco, Cecilia(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Estrada Orozco, Cecilia(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where dba American Building Supply is a litigant

Latest cases where JELD-WEN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AEROTEK INC. A MARYLAND CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Boyd, Ken