This case was last updated from Not Yet Classified on 07/18/2023 at 23:51:06 (UTC).

Chin Quang Minh Thai vs. Go Pro Garage Doors Inc

Case Summary

On 04/12/2023 Chin Quang Minh Thai filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against Go Pro Garage Doors Inc. This case was filed in Not Yet Classified, Not Yet Classified. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-GDS

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Courthouse:

    Not Yet Classified

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chin Quang Minh Thai

Defendants

Go Pro Construction Inc

Go Pro Garage Doors Inc

Derrek Mitchell Miller

 

Court Documents

Complaint

04/12/2023; Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

04/12/2023; Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment and Case Management Conference

04/14/2023; Notice of Case Assignment and Case Management Conference

Summons

04/14/2023; Summons

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

05/02/2023; Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

05/02/2023; Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

05/02/2023; Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

05/30/2023; Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

05/30/2023; Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

05/30/2023; Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

06/06/2023; Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney; Filed By: Go Pro Garage Doors Inc (Defendant); Go Pro Construction Inc (Defendant); Derrek Mitchell Miller (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney Filed by: Go Pro Garage Doors Inc (Defendant); Go Pro Construction Inc (Defendant); Derrek Mitchell Miller (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName: Demand for Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName: Answer; Filed By: Go Pro Garage Doors Inc (Defendant); Go Pro Construction Inc (Defendant); Derrek Mitchell Miller (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketMessage: Demand for Jury Trial Filed by:; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by:; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketMessage: Answer Filed by: Go Pro Garage Doors Inc (Defendant); Go Pro Construction Inc (Defendant); Derrek Mitchell Miller (Defendant) Has a Declaration in Support of Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) been filed?: No; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName: Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed By: Chin Quang Minh Thai (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName: Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed By: Chin Quang Minh Thai (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2023
  • HearingMessage: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/16/2024 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .; Category: Scheduling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName: Summons; Filed By: Minh Thai, Chin Quang (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName: Notice of Case Assignment and Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketName: RECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketMessage: Summons filed. Filed By: Minh Thai, Chin Quang (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Minh Thai, Chin Quang (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName: Complaint; Filed By: Minh Thai, Chin Quang (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Filed By: Minh Thai, Chin Quang (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketMessage: Complaint filed. Filed By: Minh Thai, Chin Quang (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketMessage: Case assigned to Department 38 .; Category: Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less