This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 07/18/2023 at 23:51:06 (UTC).

Chin Quang Minh Thai vs. Go Pro Garage Doors Inc

Case Summary

On 04/12/2023 Chin Quang Minh Thai filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Go Pro Garage Doors Inc. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-GDS

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chin Quang Minh Thai

Defendants

Go Pro Construction Inc

Go Pro Garage Doors Inc

Derrek Mitchell Miller

 

Court Documents

Complaint

04/12/2023; Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

04/12/2023; Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment and Case Management Conference

04/14/2023; Notice of Case Assignment and Case Management Conference

Summons

04/14/2023; Summons

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

05/02/2023; Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

05/02/2023; Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

05/02/2023; Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

05/30/2023; Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

05/30/2023; Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

05/30/2023; Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

06/06/2023; Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

 

Docket Entries

06/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketName: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney; Filed By: Go Pro Garage Doors Inc (Defendant); Go Pro Construction Inc (Defendant); Derrek Mitchell Miller (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023

DocketMessage: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney Filed by: Go Pro Garage Doors Inc (Defendant); Go Pro Construction Inc (Defendant); Derrek Mitchell Miller (Defendant); Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketName: Demand for Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketName: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketName: Answer; Filed By: Go Pro Garage Doors Inc (Defendant); Go Pro Construction Inc (Defendant); Derrek Mitchell Miller (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023

DocketMessage: Demand for Jury Trial Filed by:; Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023

DocketMessage: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by:; Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023

DocketMessage: Answer Filed by: Go Pro Garage Doors Inc (Defendant); Go Pro Construction Inc (Defendant); Derrek Mitchell Miller (Defendant) Has a Declaration in Support of Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) been filed?: No; Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketName: Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed By: Chin Quang Minh Thai (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketName: Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed By: Chin Quang Minh Thai (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
04/14/2023

HearingMessage: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/16/2024 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .; Category: Scheduling

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketName: Summons; Filed By: Minh Thai, Chin Quang (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketName: Notice of Case Assignment and Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2023

DocketName: RECEIPT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2023

DocketMessage: Summons filed. Filed By: Minh Thai, Chin Quang (Plaintiff); Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketName: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Minh Thai, Chin Quang (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketName: Complaint; Filed By: Minh Thai, Chin Quang (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023

DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Filed By: Minh Thai, Chin Quang (Plaintiff); Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023

DocketMessage: Complaint filed. Filed By: Minh Thai, Chin Quang (Plaintiff); Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023

DocketMessage: Case assigned to Department 38 .; Category: Case

[+] Read More [-] Read Less