This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 08/30/2023 at 08:43:38 (UTC).

Venera Pavlushkina vs. City of Sacramento

Case Summary

On 04/18/2023 Venera Pavlushkina filed an Other lawsuit against City of Sacramento. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-GDS

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Venera Pavlushkina

Defendant

City of Sacramento

 

Court Documents

Minute Order (Motion for Relief from Government Requirements)

08/15/2023; Minute Order (Motion for Relief from Government Requirements)

Tentative Ruling (Motion for Relief from Government Requirements)

08/14/2023; Tentative Ruling (Motion for Relief from Government Requirements)

Proof of Service Electronic

08/10/2023; Proof of Service Electronic

Reply to Opp to Petition

08/10/2023; Reply to Opp to Petition

Opposition to Petition to Relieve Petitioner From Requirements of Government

08/02/2023; Opposition to Petition to Relieve Petitioner From Requirements of Government

Proof of Personal Service

05/17/2023; Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

05/17/2023; Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Disclosure

05/05/2023; Notice of Disclosure

Proof of Service Personal Service

05/03/2023; Proof of Service Personal Service

Proof of Service Personal Service

05/03/2023; Proof of Service Personal Service

Declaration of Alla V. Vorobets iso Petition to Relieve Petitioner from the Requirements of Government Code Section 945.4 Pursuant to Government Code 946.6

04/21/2023; Declaration of Alla V. Vorobets iso Petition to Relieve Petitioner from the Requirements of Government Code Section 945.4 Pursuant to Government Code 946.6

Declaration of Venera Pavlushkina iso Petition to Relieve Petitioner from the Requirements of Government Code Section 945.4 Pursuant to Government Code 946.6

04/21/2023; Declaration of Venera Pavlushkina iso Petition to Relieve Petitioner from the Requirements of Government Code Section 945.4 Pursuant to Government Code 946.6

Memorandum of Points & Authorities for an Order to Relieve Petitioner from the Requirements of Government Code Section 945.4 Pursuant to Government Code 946.6

04/21/2023; Memorandum of Points & Authorities for an Order to Relieve Petitioner from the Requirements of Government Code Section 945.4 Pursuant to Government Code 946.6

Notice of Hearing on Petition to Relieve Petitioner from the Requirements of Government Code Section 945.4 Pursuant to Government Code 946.6

04/21/2023; Notice of Hearing on Petition to Relieve Petitioner from the Requirements of Government Code Section 945.4 Pursuant to Government Code 946.6

Declaration of Alla V. Vorobets ISO Petition

04/18/2023; Declaration of Alla V. Vorobets ISO Petition

Declaration of Venera Pavlushkina ISO Petition

04/18/2023; Declaration of Venera Pavlushkina ISO Petition

Summons

04/18/2023; Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

04/18/2023; Civil Case Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/15/2023

HearingMessage: Motion for Relief from Government Requirements scheduled for 08/15/2023 at 01:30 PM in Hall of Justice at Department 53 updated: Result Date to 08/15/2023 Result Type to Held - Motion Granted; Category: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketName: Minute Order (Motion for Relief from Government Requirements)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketMessage: Minute Order (Motion for Relief from Government Requirements); Category: Minute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketName: Tentative Ruling (Motion for Relief from Government Requirements)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023

DocketMessage: Tentative Ruling (Motion for Relief from Government Requirements); Category: Tentative Ruling

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketName: Proof of Service Electronic; Filed By: Venera Pavlushkina (Petitioner)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketName: Reply to Opp to Petition; Filed By: Venera Pavlushkina (Petitioner)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DocketMessage: Proof of Service Electronic Filed by: Venera Pavlushkina (Petitioner); Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DocketMessage: Reply to Opp to Petition Filed by: Venera Pavlushkina (Petitioner); Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketName: Opposition to Petition to Relieve Petitioner From Requirements of Government; Filed By: City of Sacramento (Respondent)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
04/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketName: Petition for an Order to Relieve Petitioner from the Requirements of Gov. Code 945.4 Pursuant to Code 946.6; Filed By: Venera Pavlushkina (Petitioner)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023

DocketMessage: Updated -- Petition for an Order to Relieve Petitioner from the Requirements of Gov. Code 945.4 Pursuant to Code 946.6: Status Date changed from 04/18/2023 to 04/18/2023 Name Extension changed from for An Order to Relieve Petitioner from The Requirements of Gov. Code 945.4 Pursuant to Code 946.6 to for an Order to Relieve Petitioner from the Requirements of Gov. Code 945.4 Pursuant to Code 946.6; Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023

DocketMessage: Updated -- [mche] Notice of Disclosure: Status Date changed from 04/18/2023 to 04/18/2023 Status: Filed; Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023

DocketMessage: Summons filed. Filed By: Pavlushkina, Venera (Petitioner); Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023

DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Filed By: Pavlushkina, Venera (Petitioner); Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023

DocketMessage: Petition-Other (Civil Unlimited) (for An Order to Relieve Petitioner from The Requirements of Gov. Code 945.4 Pursuant to Code 946.6) filed. Filed By: Venera Pavlushkina (Petitioner); Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023

DocketMessage: Case assigned to Department 53 .; Category: Case

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023

DocketMessage: Notice of Disclosure; Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023

DocketMessage: Declaration - Other (of Alla V. Vorobets ISO Petition) filed. Filed By: Pavlushkina, Venera (Petitioner); Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023

DocketMessage: Declaration - Other (of Venera Pavlushkina ISO Petition) filed. Filed By: Pavlushkina, Venera (Petitioner); Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less