This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/28/2023 at 11:54:05 (UTC).

Alex Francis Singh vs. FCA US LLC

Case Summary

On 03/30/2023 Alex Francis Singh filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7176

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Singh, Alex Francis

Defendants

Does 1-10

FCA US LLC

Folsom Lake Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tionna Dolin

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/23/2024 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/23/2024 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

Summons filed

Summons filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2024
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 43; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Singh, Alex(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Singh, Alex(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/23/2024 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 04/03/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Singh, Alex(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Singh, Alex(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less