This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/12/2021 at 14:16:22 (UTC).

Carl L. Miller vs. Axon Enterprises, Inc.,

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 Carl L Miller filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Axon Enterprises, Inc . This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5421

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Miller, Carl L.

Defendants

Smith, Patrick W.

Axon Enterprises, Inc.,

 

Court Documents

Order - Other (Delay In Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (Delay In Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Miller, Carl(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Miller, Carl(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Miller, Carl(Plaintiff))

Proposed Order (Proposed Order Granting Defendant Axon Enterprise Inc Demurrer to plaintiffs Complaint) filed.

Proposed Order (Proposed Order Granting Defendant Axon Enterprise Inc Demurrer to plaintiffs Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Axon Enterprises, Inc.,(Defendant))

Proposed Order (Order Granting Defendant Axon Enterprise Inc Demurrer to Plaintiff Complaint) filed.

Proposed Order (Order Granting Defendant Axon Enterprise Inc Demurrer to Plaintiff Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Axon Enterprises, Inc.,(Defendant))

Motion to Strike (Defendant Axon Enterprise Inc. Notice ofMotion to Strike Plantiff's Complaint) filed.

Motion to Strike (Defendant Axon Enterprise Inc. Notice ofMotion to Strike Plantiff's Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Axon Enterprises, Inc.,(Defendant))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Defendant Axon Enterprise MPA ISO Motion to Strike) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Defendant Axon Enterprise MPA ISO Motion to Strike) filed. (Filed By: Axon Enterprises, Inc.,(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (Dec of Elizabeth Mcnulty on behalf of Axon Enterprise Inc Re: Inability to comply with Meet and Confer Requirement Prior to Filing of Demurrer and motion to strike) filed.

Declaration - Other (Dec of Elizabeth Mcnulty on behalf of Axon Enterprise Inc Re: Inability to comply with Meet and Confer Requirement Prior to Filing of Demurrer and motion to strike) filed. (Filed By: Axon Enterprises, Inc.,(Defendant))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Defendant Axon Enterprise MPA ISO Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Defendant Axon Enterprise MPA ISO Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Axon Enterprises, Inc.,(Defendant))

Demurrer (Defendant Axon Enterprises Inc Notice of Demurrer to Plaintifff's Complaint) filed.

Demurrer (Defendant Axon Enterprises Inc Notice of Demurrer to Plaintifff's Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Axon Enterprises, Inc.,(Defendant))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Miller, Carl(Plaintiff))

Reply (ISO of Motion to strike) filed.

Reply (ISO of Motion to strike) filed. (Filed By: Axon Enterprises, Inc.,(Defendant))

Reply (ISO Demurrer to Plfs Complaint) filed.

Reply (ISO Demurrer to Plfs Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Axon Enterprises, Inc.,(Defendant))

Amended Complaint (First) filed.

Amended Complaint (First) filed. (Filed By: Miller, Carl(Plaintiff))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Oppo to Demurrer) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Oppo to Demurrer) filed. (Filed By: Miller, Carl(Plaintiff))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Oppo to Motion to Strike) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Oppo to Motion to Strike) filed. (Filed By: Miller, Carl(Plaintiff))

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply (ISO Demurrer to Plfs Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Axon Enterprises, Inc.,(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply (ISO of Motion to strike) filed. (Filed By: Axon Enterprises, Inc.,(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint (First) filed. (Filed By: Miller, Carl(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities (in Oppo to Motion to Strike) filed. (Filed By: Miller, Carl(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities (in Oppo to Demurrer) filed. (Filed By: Miller, Carl(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketProposed Order filed. (Filed By: Miller, Carl(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP scheduled for 03/02/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 53 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketMotion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 03/02/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 53 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Strike (Defendant Axon Enterprise Inc. Notice ofMotion to Strike Plantiff's Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Axon Enterprises, Inc.,(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order (Order Granting Defendant Axon Enterprise Inc Demurrer to Plaintiff Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Axon Enterprises, Inc.,(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order (Proposed Order Granting Defendant Axon Enterprise Inc Demurrer to plaintiffs Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Axon Enterprises, Inc.,(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Miller, Carl(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Miller, Carl(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 09/24/2020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Miller, Carl(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Miller, Carl(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Delay In Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TASER INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant