This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 01/08/2023 at 00:08:33 (UTC).

Cadles Of West Virginia LLC, an Ohio limited liability company vs. Des Professional Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/25/2022 Cadles Of West Virginia LLC, an Ohio limited liability company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Des Professional Services, Inc. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8859

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cadles Of West Virginia LLC, an Ohio limited liability company

Defendants

Des Professional Services, Inc.

Does 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Holly Walker

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Order - Other (Delay In Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

Order - Other (Delay In Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

Summons filed

Summons filed

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Request - Entry of Default filed

Request - Entry of Default filed

Case Management Statement filed

Case Management Statement filed

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 09/30/2022 08:30:00 AM published

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 09/30/2022 08:30:00 AM published

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 09/30/2022 08:30:00 AM

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 09/30/2022 08:30:00 AM

Request - Court Judgment filed

Request - Court Judgment filed

Declaration - Other (of Holly Walker in Support of Request for Entry of Default Judgment by Court) filed

Declaration - Other (of Holly Walker in Support of Request for Entry of Default Judgment by Court) filed

Declaration - Other (of Doug Harrah in Support of Request Entry of Default Judgment by Court) filed

Declaration - Other (of Doug Harrah in Support of Request Entry of Default Judgment by Court) filed

Declaration - Other (Summary of Case in Support of Plaintiff Cadles of West Virginia LLC's Request for Entry of Default Judgment by Court) filed

Declaration - Other (Summary of Case in Support of Plaintiff Cadles of West Virginia LLC's Request for Entry of Default Judgment by Court) filed

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Declaration - Other (Summary of Case in Support of Plaintiff Cadles of West Virginia LLC's Request for Entry of Default Judgment by Court) filed; Filed By: Cadles Of West Virginia LLC, an Ohio limited liability company(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Declaration - Other (of Doug Harrah in Support of Request Entry of Default Judgment by Court) filed; Filed By: Cadles Of West Virginia LLC, an Ohio limited liability company(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Declaration - Other (of Holly Walker in Support of Request for Entry of Default Judgment by Court) filed; Filed By: Cadles Of West Virginia LLC, an Ohio limited liability company(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Request - Court Judgment filed; Filed By: Cadles Of West Virginia LLC, an Ohio limited liability company(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketPast Hearings; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 38; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 09/30/2022 08:30:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 09/30/2022 08:30:00 AM published

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Statement filed; Filed By: Cadles Of West Virginia LLC, an Ohio limited liability company(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Default entered as to Des Professional Services, Inc. on Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Request - Entry of Default filed; Filed By: Cadles Of West Virginia LLC, an Ohio limited liability company(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Cadles Of West Virginia LLC, an Ohio limited liability company(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 09/30/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Cadles Of West Virginia LLC, an Ohio limited liability company(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 04/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 38

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Delay In Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed; Filed By: Cadles Of West Virginia LLC, an Ohio limited liability company(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Cadles Of West Virginia LLC, an Ohio limited liability company(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Cadles Of West Virginia LLC, an Ohio limited liability company(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less