Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 01/04/2019 at 13:38:02 (UTC).

C. A. Rasmussen, Inc., a California corporation vs. California Department of Transportation, a political subdivision of the State of California

Case Summary

On 09/14/2018 C A Rasmussen, Inc , a California corporation filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against California Department of Transportation, a political subdivision of the State of California. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2986

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

C. A. Rasmussen, Inc., a California corporation

Respondents

Granite Construction Company, a California corporation

California Department of Transportation, a political subdivision of the State of California

Does 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Jeffrey S Hurst

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: C. A. Rasmussen, Inc., a California corporation(Petitioner))

Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed.

Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed. (Filed By: C. A. Rasmussen, Inc., a California corporation(Petitioner))

Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed.

Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed. (Filed By: C. A. Rasmussen, Inc., a California corporation(Petitioner))

Ex Parte Application - Other (for Alternative Writ of Mandate & OSC Why Peremptory Writ Should Not Issue & for TRO) filed.

Ex Parte Application - Other (for Alternative Writ of Mandate & OSC Why Peremptory Writ Should Not Issue & for TRO) filed. (Filed By: C. A. Rasmussen, Inc., a California corporation(Petitioner))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Ex Parte Application) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Ex Parte Application) filed. (Filed By: C. A. Rasmussen, Inc., a California corporation(Petitioner))

Proposed Order (Granting Ex Parte Application) filed.

Proposed Order (Granting Ex Parte Application) filed. (Filed By: C. A. Rasmussen, Inc., a California corporation(Petitioner))

Ex Parte Application - Other (for Alternative Writ of Mandate & for OSC Why Peremptory Writ Should not Issue & for TRO) filed.

Ex Parte Application - Other (for Alternative Writ of Mandate & for OSC Why Peremptory Writ Should not Issue & for TRO) filed. (Filed By: C. A. Rasmussen, Inc., a California corporation(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other (of Jeffrey S Hurst Re: Notice of Ex Parte Application) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Jeffrey S Hurst Re: Notice of Ex Parte Application) filed. (Filed By: C. A. Rasmussen, Inc., a California corporation(Petitioner))

Opposition (to Exparte Application for Alternative Writ of Mandate) filed.

Opposition (to Exparte Application for Alternative Writ of Mandate) filed. (Filed By: Granite Construction Company, a California corporation(Respondent))

Declaration - Other (of Thomas James in Support to Opposition to Exparte Application for Alternative Writ of Mandate) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Thomas James in Support to Opposition to Exparte Application for Alternative Writ of Mandate) filed. (Filed By: Granite Construction Company, a California corporation(Respondent))

Notice - Other (Notice of Taking Off Calendar the Ex Parte Application of Petitioner for Alternative Writ of Mandate and OSC Why Peremptory Writ Should Not Issue; and For TRO) filed.

Notice - Other (Notice of Taking Off Calendar the Ex Parte Application of Petitioner for Alternative Writ of Mandate and OSC Why Peremptory Writ Should Not Issue; and For TRO) filed. (Filed By: C. A. Rasmussen, Inc., a California corporation(Petitioner))

Order - Other (Order Taking Ex Parte Application Off Calendar) filed.

Order - Other (Order Taking Ex Parte Application Off Calendar) filed.

Petition for Writ of Mandate filed.

Petition for Writ of Mandate filed. (Filed By: C. A. Rasmussen, Inc., a California corporation(Petitioner))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: C. A. Rasmussen, Inc., a California corporation(Petitioner))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: C. A. Rasmussen, Inc., a California corporation(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other (of Eric Landegger in Support of Petition) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Eric Landegger in Support of Petition) filed. (Filed By: C. A. Rasmussen, Inc., a California corporation(Petitioner))

Case initiation form printed .

Case initiation form printed .

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2018
  • Notice of Dismissal generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: C. A. Rasmussen, Inc., a California corporation(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Other (Order Taking Ex Parte Application Off Calendar) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (Notice of Taking Off Calendar the Ex Parte Application of Petitioner for Alternative Writ of Mandate and OSC Why Peremptory Writ Should Not Issue; and For TRO) filed. (Filed By: C. A. Rasmussen, Inc., a California corporation(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Ex Parte Application for Alternative Writ - Writ of Mandate scheduled for 10/04/2018 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 17 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (of Thomas James in Support to Opposition to Exparte Application for Alternative Writ of Mandate) filed. (Filed By: Granite Construction Company, a California corporation(Respondent))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Opposition (to Exparte Application for Alternative Writ of Mandate) filed. (Filed By: Granite Construction Company, a California corporation(Respondent))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (of Jeffrey S Hurst Re: Notice of Ex Parte Application) filed. (Filed By: C. A. Rasmussen, Inc., a California corporation(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Application - Other (for Alternative Writ of Mandate & for OSC Why Peremptory Writ Should not Issue & for TRO) filed. (Filed By: C. A. Rasmussen, Inc., a California corporation(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Ex Parte Application for Alternative Writ - Writ of Mandate scheduled for 10/04/2018 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 17 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Ex Parte Application) filed. (Filed By: C. A. Rasmussen, Inc., a California corporation(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Application - Other (for Alternative Writ of Mandate & OSC Why Peremptory Writ Should Not Issue & for TRO) filed. (Filed By: C. A. Rasmussen, Inc., a California corporation(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed. (Filed By: C. A. Rasmussen, Inc., a California corporation(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed. (Filed By: C. A. Rasmussen, Inc., a California corporation(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Case assigned to Department 27 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (of Eric Landegger in Support of Petition) filed. (Filed By: C. A. Rasmussen, Inc., a California corporation(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: C. A. Rasmussen, Inc., a California corporation(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: C. A. Rasmussen, Inc., a California corporation(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Writ of Mandate filed. (Filed By: C. A. Rasmussen, Inc., a California corporation(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CA Rasmussen, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where GRANITE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hurst, Jeffrey S