This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 12/12/2019 at 13:00:35 (UTC).

Bryan Malone vs. Jennifer Pettus

Case Summary

On 11/14/2019 Bryan Malone filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Jennifer Pettus. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8925

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Malone, Bryan

Defendants

Does 1-10

Pettus, Jeffrey

Pettus, Jennifer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph J Babich

 

Court Documents

Demand for Jury Trial filed.

Demand for Jury Trial filed. (Filed By: Pettus, Jeffrey(Defendant); Pettus, Jennifer(Defendant))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Malone, Bryan(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Malone, Bryan(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/14/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/14/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Malone, Bryan(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Malone, Bryan(Plaintiff))

Answer (To Complaint) filed.

Answer (To Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Pettus, Jeffrey(Defendant); Pettus, Jennifer(Defendant))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Malone, Bryan(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed. (Filed By: Pettus, Jeffrey(Defendant); Pettus, Jennifer(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (To Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Pettus, Jeffrey(Defendant); Pettus, Jennifer(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Malone, Bryan(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Malone, Bryan(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/14/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 23 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 11/14/2019 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Malone, Bryan(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Malone, Bryan(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Malone, Bryan(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less