This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/18/2022 at 13:37:13 (UTC).

Bryan Culp vs. FPI Management, INC., a California corporation

Case Summary

On 02/25/2022 Bryan Culp filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against FPI Management, INC , a California corporation. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6062

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Culp, Bryan

on behalf of all those similarly situated and aggrieved employees

Defendants

Does 1-20

FPI Management, INC., a California corporation

Treadaway, Dennis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gabriel J Pimentel

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Summons filed

Summons filed

Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed

Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed

Notice of Related Case filed

Notice of Related Case filed

Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination filed

Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination filed; Filed By: FPI Management, INC., a California corporation(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Related Case filed; Filed By: FPI Management, INC., a California corporation(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case reassigned to 25 effective 03/22/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Culp, Bryan(Plaintiff); on behalf of all those similarly situated and aggrieved employees(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Designated a complex action on 03/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Culp, Bryan(Plaintiff); on behalf of all those similarly situated and aggrieved employees(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Culp, Bryan(Plaintiff); on behalf of all those similarly situated and aggrieved employees(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FPI MANAGEMENT, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PIMENTEL GABRIEL J