This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/13/2021 at 17:50:49 (UTC).

Brooklynn Witkowski vs. Zach Bennett

Case Summary

On 11/20/2020 Brooklynn Witkowski filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Zach Bennett. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9772

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Witkowski, Emma

Witkowski, Brooklynn

Defendants

Does 1-10

Bennett, Zach

Bennett, Brittany

Guardian Ad Litem

Witkowski, Ray

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul N Philips

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Witkowski, Brooklynn(Plaintiff); Witkowski, Emma(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Witkowski, Brooklynn(Plaintiff); Witkowski, Emma(Plaintiff))

Order - Other filed.

Order - Other filed. (Filed By: Witkowski, Brooklynn(Plaintiff); Witkowski, Emma(Plaintiff))

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem submitted by Witkowski, Brooklynn; Witkowski, Emma rejected on 12/08/2020 .

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem submitted by Witkowski, Brooklynn; Witkowski, Emma rejected on 12/08/2020 . (Filed By: Witkowski, Brooklynn(Plaintiff); Witkowski, Emma(Plaintiff))

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Witkowski, Brooklynn(Plaintiff))

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Witkowski, Emma(Plaintiff))

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketWitkowski, Ray added as a Guardian Ad Litem CR effective 01/06/2021 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Witkowski, Brooklynn(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Witkowski, Emma(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem submitted by Witkowski, Brooklynn; Witkowski, Emma rejected on 12/08/2020 . (Filed By: Witkowski, Brooklynn(Plaintiff); Witkowski, Emma(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Witkowski, Brooklynn(Plaintiff); Witkowski, Emma(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Witkowski, Brooklynn(Plaintiff); Witkowski, Emma(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 31 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other filed. (Filed By: Witkowski, Brooklynn(Plaintiff); Witkowski, Emma(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PHILIPS PAUL N