This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/08/2021 at 17:41:33 (UTC).

Brittney Rand vs. Kathleen Ann Davis

Case Summary

On 05/28/2020 Brittney Rand filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Kathleen Ann Davis. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9690

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rand, Brittney

Claimant

San Juan Unified School District

Defendants

Davis, Ronald

Does 1-30

Davis, Kathleen Ann

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John N Demas

Claimant Attorney

Richard A Weyuker

Defendant Attorney

Mark D McCauley

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Rand, Brittney(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Rand, Brittney(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Davis, Kathleen(Defendant); Davis, Ronald(Defendant))

Demand for Jury Trial filed.

Demand for Jury Trial filed. (Filed By: Davis, Kathleen(Defendant); Davis, Ronald(Defendant))

Order - Other (re: Initial CMC) filed.

Order - Other (re: Initial CMC) filed.

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: San Juan Unified School District(Lien Claimant))

Notice of Lien filed.

Notice of Lien filed. (Filed By: San Juan Unified School District(Lien Claimant))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Rand, Brittney(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Rand, Brittney(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Rand, Brittney(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/17/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/17/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 31; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: San Juan Unified School District(Lien Claimant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (re: Initial CMC) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed. (Filed By: Davis, Kathleen(Defendant); Davis, Ronald(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed. (Filed By: Davis, Kathleen(Defendant); Davis, Ronald(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Rand, Brittney(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Rand, Brittney(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketSan Juan Unified School District added as a Lien Claimant effective 06/12/2020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketWeyuker, Richard A added as a effective 06/12/2020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lien filed. (Filed By: San Juan Unified School District(Lien Claimant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 06/02/2020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/17/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Rand, Brittney(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Rand, Brittney(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Rand, Brittney(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 31 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Juan Unified School District is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Weyuker, Richard A.