This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/10/2023 at 13:04:49 (UTC).

Brenda Mendez vs. City of Sacramento

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 Brenda Mendez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against City of Sacramento. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3099

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mendez, Brenda

Ollen Broadhurst, Denzil

Waymack, Karen

Defendants

City of Sacramento

Does 1-50

Sacramento Police Department

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert S. Glassman

Defendant Attorney

Susana Alcala Wood

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 10/27/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 10/27/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

Summons filed

Summons filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Answer filed

Answer filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 38; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer filed; Filed By: City of Sacramento(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Mendez, Brenda(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Mendez, Brenda(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Mendez, Brenda(Plaintiff); Ollen Broadhurst, Denzil(Plaintiff); Waymack, Karen(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 10/27/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 01/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 38

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Mendez, Brenda(Plaintiff); Ollen Broadhurst, Denzil(Plaintiff); Waymack, Karen(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Mendez, Brenda(Plaintiff); Ollen Broadhurst, Denzil(Plaintiff); Waymack, Karen(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less