This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/18/2022 at 00:23:36 (UTC).

Blackrock Industries, INC. vs. Power Up Electrical Contractors LLC, a Missouri limited liability company,

Case Summary

On 08/13/2021 Blackrock Industries, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Power Up Electrical Contractors LLC, a Missouri limited liability company,. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6166

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Blackrock Industries, INC.

Defendants

Clayco, INC., a Missouri corporation

Does 1-100

NP Sacramento Map, LLC, a Missouri, limited liability

Power Up Electrical Contractors LLC, a Missouri limited liability company,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lanny T Winberry

 

Court Documents

Notice of Pendency of Action filed.

Notice of Pendency of Action filed. (Filed By: Blackrock Industries, INC.(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Blackrock Industries, INC.(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Blackrock Industries, INC.(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Blackrock Industries, INC.(Plaintiff))

Notice - Other (Of Withdrawal of Notice of Lis Pendens) filed

Notice - Other (Of Withdrawal of Notice of Lis Pendens) filed

Request for Dismissal filed

Request for Dismissal filed

Correspondence (Returned Document) filed

Correspondence (Returned Document) filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Correspondence (Returned Document) filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Request for Dismissal filed; Filed By: Blackrock Industries, INC.(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice - Other (Of Withdrawal of Notice of Lis Pendens) filed; Filed By: Blackrock Industries, INC.(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Blackrock Industries, INC.(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Pendency of Action filed; Filed By: Blackrock Industries, INC.(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Blackrock Industries, INC.(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Blackrock Industries, INC.(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less