This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 06/26/2022 at 13:35:25 (UTC).

Billy Matthew Melton vs. Stericycle, INC. (a Delaware Corporation)

Case Summary

On 05/05/2022 Billy Matthew Melton filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Stericycle, INC a Delaware Corporation. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9484

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Melton, Billy Matthew

Defendants

Borja, Marco

Does 1-100

Garcia, Alejandro

Romero, Samuel

Sanchez, Cheryl

Stericycle, INC. (a Delaware Corporation)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Taylor Marie Prainito

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

Summons filed

Summons filed

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 31; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Melton, Billy(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 10/21/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Melton, Billy(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Melton, Billy(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Melton, Billy(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stericycle Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRAINITO TAYLOR M.