This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/17/2022 at 07:37:59 (UTC).

Beth Hunter vs. City of Folsom

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 Beth Hunter filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against City of Folsom. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3270

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hunter, Beth

Defendants

City of Folsom

County of Sacramento

Does 1-20

VCA American River Animal Hospital

Cross Defendant and Defendant

Does 1-20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chelsee M. Sachs

Defendant Attorneys

Douglas W Brown

Joann MO Rangel

 

Court Documents

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Hunter, Beth(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Hunter, Beth(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Hunter, Beth(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Hunter, Beth(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Request for Dismissal filed

Request for Dismissal filed

Answer (to Complaint) filed

Answer (to Complaint) filed

Answer filed

Answer filed

Cross-Complaint filed

Cross-Complaint filed

Summons filed

Summons filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Answer (to Cross-Complaint) filed

Answer (to Cross-Complaint) filed

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Notice of Entry of Order filed

Notice of Entry of Order filed

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 31; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Entry of Order filed; Filed By: Hunter, Beth(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/15/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer (to Cross-Complaint) filed; Filed By: VCA American River Animal Hospital(Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Hunter, Beth(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: County of Sacramento(Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Does 1-20 added as a Cross - Defendant effective 10/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Brown, Douglas W added as a effective 10/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Request for Dismissal filed; Filed By: Hunter, Beth(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Hunter, Beth(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Hunter, Beth(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed; Filed By: Hunter, Beth(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Hunter, Beth(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 06/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Hunter, Beth(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Hunter, Beth(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where City of Folsom is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SACHS CHELSEE MICHELLE