This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 01/09/2023 at 21:56:52 (UTC).

Banta-Carbona Irrigation District vs. California State Water Resources Control Board

Case Summary

On 08/19/2022 Banta-Carbona Irrigation District filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against California State Water Resources Control Board. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3931

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Banta-Carbona Irrigation District

Patterson Irrigation District

West Stanislaus Irrigation District

Respondents

California State Water Resources Control Board

Does 1-100

Erik Ekdahl, Deputy Director of California State Water Resources Control Board

Interested Party

Merced Irrigation District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Jennifer L Spaletta

Steven Herum

Interested Party Attorney

Thomas M Berliner

 

Court Documents

Petition for Writ of Mandate filed

Petition for Writ of Mandate filed

Case initiation form printed

Case initiation form printed

Notice of Related Case filed

Notice of Related Case filed

Notice of Related Case filed

Notice of Related Case filed

Notice of Entry of Order (Coordinating Sacramento Superior Court Case No. 34-2022-80003931 with JCCP 5229 in Santa Clara Superior Court) filed

Notice of Entry of Order (Coordinating Sacramento Superior Court Case No. 34-2022-80003931 with JCCP 5229 in Santa Clara Superior Court) filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Entry of Order (Coordinating Sacramento Superior Court Case No. 34-2022-80003931 with JCCP 5229 in Santa Clara Superior Court) filed; Filed By: Banta-Carbona Irrigation District(Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Related Case filed; Filed By: Banta-Carbona Irrigation District(Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Berliner, Thomas M added as a effective 09/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Merced Irrigation District added as a Interested Party effective 09/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Related Case filed; Filed By: Merced Irrigation District(Interested Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case initiation form printed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Petition for Writ of Mandate filed; Filed By: Banta-Carbona Irrigation District(Petitioner); Patterson Irrigation District(Petitioner); West Stanislaus Irrigation District(Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Banta-Carbona Irrigation District is a litigant