This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/19/2022 at 08:15:04 (UTC).

Banta-Carbona Irrigation District vs. California State Water Resources Control Board

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 Banta-Carbona Irrigation District filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against California State Water Resources Control Board. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3718

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Banta-Carbona Irrigation District

Patterson Irrigation District

West Stanislaus Irrigation District

Respondents

California State Water Resources Control Board

Does 1-100

Erik Ekdahl, Deputy Director Of California State Water Resources Control Board

Interested Parties

Central Delta Water Agency

South Delta Water Agency

Byron-Bethany Irrigation District

Merced Irrigation District

Modesto Irrigation District

San Joaquin Tributaries Authority

South San Juaquin Irrigation District, a public entity

Turlock Irrigation District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Jennifer L Spaletta

Steven Herum

Respondent Attorneys

Daniel M Fuchs

Matthew G Bullock

Interested Party Attorneys

S Dean Ruiz

Dante J Nomellini, Sr

Michael E Vergara

Phillip R McMurray

William C Paris

Timothy J Wasiewski

Arthur F Godwin

 

Court Documents

Order - Other (Motion to Transfer, Coordinate and Consolidated Cases) filed

Order - Other (Motion to Transfer, Coordinate and Consolidated Cases) filed

Declaration - Other (of Matthew G. Bullock ISO Reply to Petitioners' Oppositions to Motion to Transfer, Coordinate, and Consolidate Cases (CCP 403)) filed

Declaration - Other (of Matthew G. Bullock ISO Reply to Petitioners' Oppositions to Motion to Transfer, Coordinate, and Consolidate Cases (CCP 403)) filed

Reply to Opposition (to Motion to Transfer, Coordinate, and Consolidate Cases (CCP 403)) filed

Reply to Opposition (to Motion to Transfer, Coordinate, and Consolidate Cases (CCP 403)) filed

Declaration - Other (Of Jennifer L. Spaletta ISO Banta-Carbona Irrigation District et al's Response In Partial Opposition) filed

Declaration - Other (Of Jennifer L. Spaletta ISO Banta-Carbona Irrigation District et al's Response In Partial Opposition) filed

Response (In Partial Opposition To Respondents Motion To Transfer, Coordinate And Consolidate Cases) filed

Response (In Partial Opposition To Respondents Motion To Transfer, Coordinate And Consolidate Cases) filed

Declaration - Other (Of Jared S. Mueller ISO Byron-Bethany Irrigation District's Opposition To Respondents' Motion To Transfer, Coordinate, And Consolidate Cases) filed

Declaration - Other (Of Jared S. Mueller ISO Byron-Bethany Irrigation District's Opposition To Respondents' Motion To Transfer, Coordinate, And Consolidate Cases) filed

Opposition (To Respondents' Motion To Transfer, Coordinate, And Consolidate Cases) filed

Opposition (To Respondents' Motion To Transfer, Coordinate, And Consolidate Cases) filed

Declaration - Other (of William C Paris, III ISO Partial Opposition) filed

Declaration - Other (of William C Paris, III ISO Partial Opposition) filed

Opposition (Partial Opposition by Turlock and Modesto Irrigation District) filed

Opposition (Partial Opposition by Turlock and Modesto Irrigation District) filed

Declaration - Other (of Jennifer L. Spaletta ISO Banta-Carbona Irrigation District) filed

Declaration - Other (of Jennifer L. Spaletta ISO Banta-Carbona Irrigation District) filed

Response (in Partial Opposition to Respondents Motion to Transfer) filed

Response (in Partial Opposition to Respondents Motion to Transfer) filed

Opposition (Partial Opposition by Central Delta Water Agency and South Delta Water Agency) filed

Opposition (Partial Opposition by Central Delta Water Agency and South Delta Water Agency) filed

Declaration - Other (Of Jared S. Mueller ISO Byron-Bethany Irrigation District's Opposition To Respondents' Motion To Transfer, Coordinate, And Consolidated Cases) filed

Declaration - Other (Of Jared S. Mueller ISO Byron-Bethany Irrigation District's Opposition To Respondents' Motion To Transfer, Coordinate, And Consolidated Cases) filed

Opposition (To Respondents' Motion To Transfer, Coordinate, And Consolidate Cases) filed

Opposition (To Respondents' Motion To Transfer, Coordinate, And Consolidate Cases) filed

Declaration - Other (Of Timothy Wasiewski ISO Partial Opposition By San Joaquin Tributaries) filed

Declaration - Other (Of Timothy Wasiewski ISO Partial Opposition By San Joaquin Tributaries) filed

Request - Judicial Notice (ISO Partial Opposition By San Joaquin Tributaries) filed

Request - Judicial Notice (ISO Partial Opposition By San Joaquin Tributaries) filed

Opposition (Partial Opposition By San Joaquin Tributaries Authority To Respondent State Water Resources Control Board, ET AL.'S Motion To Transfer, Coordinate, And Consolidate Cases) filed

Opposition (Partial Opposition By San Joaquin Tributaries Authority To Respondent State Water Resources Control Board, ET AL.'S Motion To Transfer, Coordinate, And Consolidate Cases) filed

Declaration - Other (Of Hicham Eltal ISO Merced Irrigation District's Partial Opposition To Respondent State Water Resources Control Board, ET AL.'S Motion To Transfer, Coordinate, And Consolidate Cases) filed

Declaration - Other (Of Hicham Eltal ISO Merced Irrigation District's Partial Opposition To Respondent State Water Resources Control Board, ET AL.'S Motion To Transfer, Coordinate, And Consolidate Cases) filed

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Motion - Other - Writ of Mandate; Department: 32; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Motion - Other - Writ of Mandate scheduled for 04/08/2022 at 02:30:00 PM in Department 32 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Motion - Other - Writ of Mandate rescheduled to 04/08/2022 at 02:30:00 PM in Department 32 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Motion to Transfer, Coordinate and Consolidated Cases) filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Declaration - Other (of Matthew G. Bullock ISO Reply to Petitioners' Oppositions to Motion to Transfer, Coordinate, and Consolidate Cases (CCP 403)) filed; Filed By: California State Water Resources Control Board(Respondent); Erik Ekdahl, Deputy Director Of California State Water Resources Control Board(Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Reply to Opposition (to Motion to Transfer, Coordinate, and Consolidate Cases (CCP 403)) filed; Filed By: California State Water Resources Control Board(Respondent); Erik Ekdahl, Deputy Director Of California State Water Resources Control Board(Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Modesto Irrigation District added as a Interested Party effective 02/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Declaration - Other (Of Jennifer L. Spaletta ISO Banta-Carbona Irrigation District et al's Response In Partial Opposition) filed; Filed By: Banta-Carbona Irrigation District(Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Response (In Partial Opposition To Respondents Motion To Transfer, Coordinate And Consolidate Cases) filed; Filed By: Banta-Carbona Irrigation District(Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Declaration - Other (Of Jared S. Mueller ISO Byron-Bethany Irrigation District's Opposition To Respondents' Motion To Transfer, Coordinate, And Consolidate Cases) filed; Filed By: Byron-Bethany Irrigation District(Interested Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Related Case (Amended) filed; Filed By: Banta-Carbona Irrigation District(Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: South Delta Water Agency added as a Interested Party effective 09/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Central Delta Water Agency added as a Interested Party effective 09/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Related Case filed; Filed By: Central Delta Water Agency(Interested Party); South Delta Water Agency(Interested Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Related Case filed; Filed By: Banta-Carbona Irrigation District(Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Related Case filed; Filed By: California State Water Resources Control Board(Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case initiation form printed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Banta-Carbona Irrigation District(Petitioner); Patterson Irrigation District(Petitioner); West Stanislaus Irrigation District(Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Petition for Writ of Mandate filed; Filed By: Banta-Carbona Irrigation District(Petitioner); Patterson Irrigation District(Petitioner); West Stanislaus Irrigation District(Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less