This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 06/21/2019 at 13:32:28 (UTC).

Ateca Marama vs. Dimitruous Zahariudakis, Trustee of the Dimitrious Zahariudakis Revocable Trust

Case Summary

On 03/01/2019 Ateca Marama filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Dimitruous Zahariudakis, Trustee of the Dimitrious Zahariudakis Revocable Trust. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1665

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marama, Ateca

Defendants

all other persons unknown, claiming any legal or equitable right, title, estate, lien, or interest in the property adverse to Plaintiff's cloud

Dimitruous Zahariudakis, Trustee of the Dimitrious Zahariudakis Revocable Trust

Does 1-50

Placer Foreclosure Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patrick Riazi

 

Court Documents

Summons submitted by Marama, Ateca rejected on 03/08/2019 .

Summons submitted by Marama, Ateca rejected on 03/08/2019 . (Filed By: Marama, Ateca(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 09/05/2019 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 09/05/2019 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Marama, Ateca(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Marama, Ateca(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

03/08/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSummons submitted by Marama, Ateca rejected on 03/08/2019 . (Filed By: Marama, Ateca(Plaintiff))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 09/05/2019 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2019

DocketCase assigned to Department 23 .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Marama, Ateca(Plaintiff))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2019
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Marama, Ateca(Plaintiff))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less