This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/08/2021 at 14:44:53 (UTC).

Asphalt Consulting Services, LLC vs. California Construction Authority

Case Summary

On 05/22/2020 Asphalt Consulting Services, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against California Construction Authority. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9461

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Asphalt Consulting Services, LLC

Defendants

California Construction Authority

Does 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David A Frenznick

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Asphalt Consulting Services, LLC(Plaintiff))

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Asphalt Consulting Services, LLC(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Asphalt Consulting Services, LLC(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Asphalt Consulting Services, LLC(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Asphalt Consulting Services, LLC(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/10/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/10/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketComplaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/10/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Asphalt Consulting Services, LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Asphalt Consulting Services, LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 05/27/2020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/10/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Asphalt Consulting Services, LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Asphalt Consulting Services, LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Asphalt Consulting Services, LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David A Frenznick