This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/09/2021 at 12:28:21 (UTC).

Arnold Burghgraef vs. Freda Kosterman

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 Arnold Burghgraef filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Freda Kosterman. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1681

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Burghgraef, Arnold

Defendants

Does 1 through 10

Kosterman, Freda

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph J Babich

Defendant Attorney

James J McGarry

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/14/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/14/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Burghgraef, Arnold(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Burghgraef, Arnold(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Burghgraef, Arnold(Plaintiff))

Substitution of Attorney filed.

Substitution of Attorney filed. (Filed By: Kosterman, Freda(Defendant))

Demand for Jury Trial filed.

Demand for Jury Trial filed. (Filed By: Kosterman, Freda(Defendant))

Answer (To Complaint) filed.

Answer (To Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Kosterman, Freda(Defendant))

Order - Other (re:Initial CMC) filed.

Order - Other (re:Initial CMC) filed.

Declaration of Due Diligence filed.

Declaration of Due Diligence filed. (Filed By: Burghgraef, Arnold(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney filed. (Filed By: Kosterman, Freda(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 43; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketMcGarry, James J added as a effective 01/06/2021 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (To Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Kosterman, Freda(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed. (Filed By: Kosterman, Freda(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (re:Initial CMC) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence filed. (Filed By: Burghgraef, Arnold(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Burghgraef, Arnold(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/14/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Burghgraef, Arnold(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Burghgraef, Arnold(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCGARRY JAMES J. ESQ