This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 11/30/2022 at 12:35:52 (UTC).

Anecia Keaton vs. General Motors LLC

Case Summary

On 07/18/2022 Anecia Keaton filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against General Motors LLC. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3602

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Keaton, Anecia

Thompson, Sean

Defendants

Does 1-10

General Motors LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tionna Dolin

Defendant Attorneys

Cameron Major

Mary Lynn Arens

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 03/24/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 03/24/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

Summons filed

Summons filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Declaration - Other (Of Cameron Major Pursuant To CCP Section 430.41 In Response To Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint) filed

Declaration - Other (Of Cameron Major Pursuant To CCP Section 430.41 In Response To Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint) filed

Demurrer (to Complaint) filed

Demurrer (to Complaint) filed

Motion to Strike filed

Motion to Strike filed

Declaration - Other (of Arash Yaraghchian iso Demurrer and Motion to Strike Punitive Damages as to Complaint) filed

Declaration - Other (of Arash Yaraghchian iso Demurrer and Motion to Strike Punitive Damages as to Complaint) filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 43; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 31; Status: Reassigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 54; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP scheduled for 02/07/2023 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 02/07/2023 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Declaration - Other (of Arash Yaraghchian iso Demurrer and Motion to Strike Punitive Damages as to Complaint) filed; Filed By: General Motors LLC(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Motion to Strike filed; Filed By: General Motors LLC(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Demurrer (to Complaint) filed; Filed By: General Motors LLC(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Arens, Mary Lynn added as a effective 10/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case reassigned to 43 effective 10/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 03/24/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Major, Cameron added as a effective 09/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Declaration - Other (Of Cameron Major Pursuant To CCP Section 430.41 In Response To Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint) filed; Filed By: General Motors LLC(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Keaton, Anecia(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Keaton, Anecia(Plaintiff); Thompson, Sean(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 03/24/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Keaton, Anecia(Plaintiff); Thompson, Sean(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Keaton, Anecia(Plaintiff); Thompson, Sean(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOLIN TIONNA