This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/18/2022 at 14:46:09 (UTC).

Alicia M Flores vs. Save Mart Supermarkets

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 Alicia M Flores filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Save Mart Supermarkets. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8219

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Flores, Alicia M.

Defendants

Does 1-30

Save Mart Supermarkets

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph A Androvich

Defendant Attorney

Lindsay A Goulding

 

Court Documents

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Flores, Alicia(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (Order Re: Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (Order Re: Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Flores, Alicia(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Flores, Alicia(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Answer filed

Answer filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer filed; Filed By: Save Mart Supermarkets(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Flores, Alicia(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Flores, Alicia(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 38

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Order Re: Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Flores, Alicia(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Flores, Alicia(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAVE MART SUPERMARKETS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOULDING, LINDSEY A