This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 09/14/2018 at 13:32:33 (UTC).

Alex Chavez vs. Dignity Health

Case Summary

On 05/25/2018 Alex Chavez filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Dignity Health. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3784

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chavez, Alex

Defendants

Methodist Hospital of Sacramento

Dignity Health

Does 1-50

Guardian Ad Litem

Mendoza, Albert George

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lance J Curtis

 

Court Documents

Amended Complaint (First) filed.

Amended Complaint (First) filed. (Filed By: Chavez, Alex(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Chavez, Alex(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Chavez, Alex(Plaintiff); Mendoza, Albert(Guardian Ad Litem CR))

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Mendoza, Albert(Guardian Ad Litem CR))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Chavez, Alex(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Chavez, Alex(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/06/2018 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/06/2018 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Chavez, Alex(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Chavez, Alex(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint (First) filed. (Filed By: Chavez, Alex(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Chavez, Alex(Plaintiff); Mendoza, Albert(Guardian Ad Litem CR))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Mendoza, Albert(Guardian Ad Litem CR))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Mendoza, Albert George added as a Guardian Ad Litem CR effective 05/31/2018 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Application for Guardian ad Litem and Summons forwarded to D 54

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Chavez, Alex(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/06/2018 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Case assigned to Department 39 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Chavez, Alex(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Chavez, Alex(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Methodist Hospital of Sacramento is a litigant

Latest cases where DIGNITY HEALTH DBA NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CURTIS, LANCE J