This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 06/01/2019 at 13:44:16 (UTC).

Albert Heredia vs. North Highlands Recreation and Park District

Case Summary

On 07/31/2018 Albert Heredia filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against North Highlands Recreation and Park District. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7921

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Heredia, Albert

Defendants

County of Sacramento

North Highlands Recreation and Park District

Does 1-100

MP Holdings LLC

Cross Defendant

Roes 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adriana Artunduaga-Mendez

Defendant Attorneys

Carol A Wieckowski

Justin N Tierney, Jr

Catharine A Ching

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/31/2019 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/31/2019 08:30:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 01/31/2019 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 01/31/2019 08:30:00 AM .

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: North Highlands Recreation and Park District(Cross - Complainant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: MP Holdings LLC(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: County of Sacramento(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Heredia, Albert(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: MP Holdings LLC(Defendant))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: North Highlands Recreation and Park District(Defendant))

Cross-Complaint filed.

Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: North Highlands Recreation and Park District(Cross - Complainant))

Summons (on Cross-Complaint) filed.

Summons (on Cross-Complaint) filed. (Filed By: North Highlands Recreation and Park District(Cross - Complainant))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Heredia, Albert(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Heredia, Albert(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Heredia, Albert(Plaintiff))

Complaint - Doe Amendment (Doe 1) filed.

Complaint - Doe Amendment (Doe 1) filed. (Filed By: Heredia, Albert(Plaintiff))

Answer (To Complaint) filed.

Answer (To Complaint) filed. (Filed By: County of Sacramento(Defendant))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Heredia, Albert(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Heredia, Albert(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Heredia, Albert(Plaintiff))

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 23; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 01/31/2019 08:30:00 AM .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketCase Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date no later than 60 days after the effective date.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketCase Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date within 60 days of the referral date.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/31/2019 08:30:00 AM published .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Heredia, Albert(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed. (Filed By: County of Sacramento(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed. (Filed By: MP Holdings LLC(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed. (Filed By: North Highlands Recreation and Park District(Cross - Complainant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons (on Cross-Complaint) filed. (Filed By: North Highlands Recreation and Park District(Cross - Complainant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketMP Holdings LLC added as a Defendant effective 10/16/2018 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Heredia, Albert(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketHeredia, Albert Application for Waiver granted in full on 08/01/2018 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/31/2019 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 23 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 08/01/2018 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed. (Filed By: Heredia, Albert(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Heredia, Albert(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Heredia, Albert(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Heredia, Albert(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less