This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 07:35:25 (UTC).

Aids Healthcare Foundation vs. California Department of Health Care Services

Case Summary

On 09/16/2022 Aids Healthcare Foundation filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against California Department of Health Care Services. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4011

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Aids Healthcare Foundation

Respondents

California Department of Health Care Services

Michelle Baass

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Andrew F. Kim

Respondent Attorney

Dane C Barca

 

Court Documents

Report - Other (Joint Status Report Re Statust of Federal Action) filed

Report - Other (Joint Status Report Re Statust of Federal Action) filed

Declaration - Other (Of Kevin L. Quade Pursuant To Code Of Civil Procedure Section 430.41) filed

Declaration - Other (Of Kevin L. Quade Pursuant To Code Of Civil Procedure Section 430.41) filed

Request - Judicial Notice filed

Request - Judicial Notice filed

Proposed Order (Granting Respondents' Demurrer To Petition For Writ Of Mandate) filed

Proposed Order (Granting Respondents' Demurrer To Petition For Writ Of Mandate) filed

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO Respondent's Demurrer To Petition For Writ Of Mandate) filed

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO Respondent's Demurrer To Petition For Writ Of Mandate) filed

Demurrer (And Demurrer To Petition For Writ Of Mandate) filed

Demurrer (And Demurrer To Petition For Writ Of Mandate) filed

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated

Minutes finalized for heard on 11/16/2022 10:45:00 AM

Minutes finalized for heard on 11/16/2022 10:45:00 AM

Objection (Evidentiary Objections To Declaration of Michelle Retke) filed

Objection (Evidentiary Objections To Declaration of Michelle Retke) filed

Reply (Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Ex Parte Application For Stay of Administrative Decision) filed

Reply (Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Ex Parte Application For Stay of Administrative Decision) filed

Objection (Evidentiary Objections To Declaration of Raphael Davtian) filed

Objection (Evidentiary Objections To Declaration of Raphael Davtian) filed

Declaration - Other (Of Michelle Retke ISO Respondents' Opposition To Petitioner's Ex Parte Application For Stay) filed

Declaration - Other (Of Michelle Retke ISO Respondents' Opposition To Petitioner's Ex Parte Application For Stay) filed

Declaration - Other (Of Rafael Davtian ISO Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application For Stay Of Administrative Decision) filed

Declaration - Other (Of Rafael Davtian ISO Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application For Stay Of Administrative Decision) filed

Objection (To Declaration Of Michael Weinstein) filed

Objection (To Declaration Of Michael Weinstein) filed

Objection (To Declaration Of Michael Wohlfeiler) filed

Objection (To Declaration Of Michael Wohlfeiler) filed

Objection (To Declaration Of Donna Stidham) filed

Objection (To Declaration Of Donna Stidham) filed

Request - Judicial Notice filed

Request - Judicial Notice filed

Opposition (To Petitioner's Ex Parte Application For Stay Of Administrative Decision) filed

Opposition (To Petitioner's Ex Parte Application For Stay Of Administrative Decision) filed

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Writ of Mandate; Department: 21; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Hearing on Demurrer - Writ of Mandate scheduled for 02/03/2023 at 11:00:00 AM in Department 21 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Report - Other (Joint Status Report Re Statust of Federal Action) filed; Filed By: Aids Healthcare Foundation(Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Declaration - Other (Of Kevin L. Quade Pursuant To Code Of Civil Procedure Section 430.41) filed; Filed By: California Department of Health Care Services(Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Request - Judicial Notice filed; Filed By: California Department of Health Care Services(Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proposed Order (Granting Respondents' Demurrer To Petition For Writ Of Mandate) filed; Filed By: California Department of Health Care Services(Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO Respondent's Demurrer To Petition For Writ Of Mandate) filed; Filed By: California Department of Health Care Services(Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Demurrer (And Demurrer To Petition For Writ Of Mandate) filed; Filed By: California Department of Health Care Services(Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Minutes finalized for heard on 11/16/2022 10:45:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Declaration - Other (of Donna Stidham R.N.) filed; Filed By: Aids Healthcare Foundation(Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Ex Parte Application - Other (For Stay of Adminitrative Decision Pursuant to Ca Code of Civil Procedure 1094.5 (g)) filed; Filed By: Aids Healthcare Foundation(Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Declaration - Other (of Demurring or Moving Party ISO Automatic Extension) filed; Filed By: California Department of Health Care Services(Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Aids Healthcare Foundation(Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Aids Healthcare Foundation(Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case initiation form printed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Aids Healthcare Foundation(Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Aids Healthcare Foundation(Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Petition for Writ of Mandate filed; Filed By: Aids Healthcare Foundation(Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AIDS HEALTHCARE FOUNDATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dane Christian Barca