This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 10/28/2022 at 13:37:09 (UTC).

Afshin Eslami M.D. vs. Dignity Health

Case Summary

On 09/06/2022 Afshin Eslami M D filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Dignity Health. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6241

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eslami M.D., Afshin

Defendants

Dignity Health

Does 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael J Khouri

Defendant Attorney

Doreen W Shenfeld

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/02/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/02/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Summons filed

Summons filed

Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint) filed

Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint) filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 38; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Shenfeld, Doreen W added as a effective 10/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint) filed; Filed By: Dignity Health(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Eslami M.D., Afshin(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/02/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 09/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 38

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Eslami M.D., Afshin(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Eslami M.D., Afshin(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIGNITY HEALTH DBA NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KHOURI MICHAEL J