This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/09/2021 at 10:19:42 (UTC).

ACL Construction Co Inc vs. Myers and Sons Constructions LP

Case Summary

On 07/08/2020 ACL Construction Co Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Myers and Sons Constructions LP. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1582

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ACL Construction Co Inc

Defendants

Does 1-10

Myers and Sons Constructions LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John C Goodman

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/14/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/14/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: ACL Construction Co Inc(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: ACL Construction Co Inc(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: ACL Construction Co Inc(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: ACL Construction Co Inc(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (re:Initial CMC) filed.

Order - Other (re:Initial CMC) filed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketComplaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/14/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: ACL Construction Co Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (re:Initial CMC) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: ACL Construction Co Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 07/09/2020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/14/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: ACL Construction Co Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: ACL Construction Co Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 31 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MYERS & SONS CONSTRUCTION LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOODMAN JOHN