Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/20/2021 at 06:11:59 (UTC).

Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc. vs. Flat Roof Pros

Case Summary

On 12/29/2020 Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Flat Roof Pros. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1623

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc.

Defendants

Does 1-75

Frydenlund, Liza

Flat Roof Pros

Frydenlund, Allan

American Builders and Contractors Supply Co. Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John M Pagan

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc.(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc.(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc.(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc.(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 01/05/2021 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN BUILDERS & CONTRACTORS SUPPLY CO., INC., a corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAGAN JOHN