This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/16/2022 at 02:08:28 (UTC).

4320 Stockton Blvd. LLC. a California Limited Liability Company vs. Hue Tran

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 4320 Stockton Blvd LLC a California Limited Liability Company filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Hue Tran. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1553

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

4320 Stockton Blvd. LLC. a California Limited Liability Company

Defendant

Tran, Hue

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Josiah M Prendergast

Defendant Attorney

John S Knowlton

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: 4320 Stockton Blvd. LLC. a California Limited Liability Company(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: 4320 Stockton Blvd. LLC. a California Limited Liability Company(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: 4320 Stockton Blvd. LLC. a California Limited Liability Company(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Answer filed

Answer filed

Proof of Service - MAILING filed

Proof of Service - MAILING filed

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Case Management Statement filed

Case Management Statement filed

Proof of Service (Electronic Service) filed

Proof of Service (Electronic Service) filed

Case Management Statement filed

Case Management Statement filed

Notice of Remote Appearance filed

Notice of Remote Appearance filed

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/25/2022 08:30:00 AM published

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/25/2022 08:30:00 AM published

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 38; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/25/2022 08:30:00 AM published

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Remote Appearance filed; Filed By: 4320 Stockton Blvd. LLC. a California Limited Liability Company(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Statement filed; Filed By: 4320 Stockton Blvd. LLC. a California Limited Liability Company(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service (Electronic Service) filed; Filed By: Tran, Hue(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Statement filed; Filed By: Tran, Hue(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 03/25/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 38

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service - MAILING filed; Filed By: Tran, Hue(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer filed; Filed By: Tran, Hue(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: 4320 Stockton Blvd. LLC. a California Limited Liability Company(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 06/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: 4320 Stockton Blvd. LLC. a California Limited Liability Company(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: 4320 Stockton Blvd. LLC. a California Limited Liability Company(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: 4320 Stockton Blvd. LLC. a California Limited Liability Company(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KNOWLTON, JOHN S.