Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/19/2021 at 02:00:06 (UTC).

2491 Rhine Way Elverta, CA 95626

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 2491 Rhine Way Elverta, CA 95626 was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3961

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Clear Recon Corp

Claimant

Torres, Adrian

Interested Party

Granillo, Arthur

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Casper J Rankin

Claimant Attorney

S David Kozich

 

Court Documents

Notice - Other (of Claim and Claim for Distribution of Surplus Funds) filed.

Notice - Other (of Claim and Claim for Distribution of Surplus Funds) filed. (Filed By: Torres, Adrian(Claimant))

Declaration - Other (of Adrian Torres ISO Claim) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Adrian Torres ISO Claim) filed. (Filed By: Torres, Adrian(Claimant))

Minutes finalized for Petition - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 04/14/2021 01:30:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Petition - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 04/14/2021 01:30:00 PM .

Notice of Related Case filed.

Notice of Related Case filed. (Filed By: Torres, Adrian(Claimant))

Notice of Entry of Order (To Allow Clear Recon Corp To Deposit The Surplus Proceeds Of The Trustee's Sale And For TH) filed.

Notice of Entry of Order (To Allow Clear Recon Corp To Deposit The Surplus Proceeds Of The Trustee's Sale And For TH) filed. (Filed By: Clear Recon Corp(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other filed.

Declaration - Other filed. (Filed By: Granillo, Arthur(Interested Party))

Returned Mail

Returned Mail

Petition-Other (Civil Unlimited) (and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale) filed.

Petition-Other (Civil Unlimited) (and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale) filed. (Filed By: Clear Recon Corp(Petitioner))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Clear Recon Corp(Petitioner))

Notice - Other (of Petition to Superior Court to Deposit Surplus Funds) filed.

Notice - Other (of Petition to Superior Court to Deposit Surplus Funds) filed. (Filed By: Clear Recon Corp(Petitioner))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO Allowing Deposit of Surplus Funds) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO Allowing Deposit of Surplus Funds) filed. (Filed By: Clear Recon Corp(Petitioner))

Proof of Service filed.

Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: Clear Recon Corp(Petitioner))

Order - Other (GRANTED Order and Notice of Hearing) filed.

Order - Other (GRANTED Order and Notice of Hearing) filed.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case filed. (Filed By: Torres, Adrian(Claimant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 1:30 PM; Event Type: Petition - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Petition - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 04/14/2021 01:30:00 PM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketTorres, Adrian added as a Claimant effective 04/07/2021 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketKozich, S David added as a effective 04/07/2021 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (of Claim and Claim for Distribution of Surplus Funds) filed. (Filed By: Torres, Adrian(Claimant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Adrian Torres ISO Claim) filed. (Filed By: Torres, Adrian(Claimant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed. (Filed By: Granillo, Arthur(Interested Party))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order (To Allow Clear Recon Corp To Deposit The Surplus Proceeds Of The Trustee's Sale And For TH) filed. (Filed By: Clear Recon Corp(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketPetition - Other - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 04/14/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 53 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (GRANTED Order and Notice of Hearing) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition-Other (Civil Unlimited) (and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale) filed. (Filed By: Clear Recon Corp(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Clear Recon Corp(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (of Petition to Superior Court to Deposit Surplus Funds) filed. (Filed By: Clear Recon Corp(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO Allowing Deposit of Surplus Funds) filed. (Filed By: Clear Recon Corp(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed. (Filed By: Clear Recon Corp(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 53 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Clear Recon Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOZICH S. DAVID