Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 08/21/2019 at 00:49:46 (UTC).

Xai Thao vs. 99 Ranch Market

Case Summary

On 01/23/2014 Xai Thao filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against 99 Ranch Market. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7751

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THAO, XAI

Defendants

99 RANCH MARKET

DOES 1-100

TAWA CALIFORNIA SUPERMARKET INC

TAWA SUPERMARKET INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Will M. Yamada

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Thao, Xai(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Thao, Xai(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Thao, Xai(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (Order for Notice of Assignment to Department 35 for Complex Case Management Determination) filed.

Order - Other (Order for Notice of Assignment to Department 35 for Complex Case Management Determination) filed.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Thao, Xai(Plaintiff))

Request - Other (Req & Order for Dismissal) submitted by Thao, Xai rejected on 07/07/2014 .

Request - Other (Req & Order for Dismissal) submitted by Thao, Xai rejected on 07/07/2014 . (Filed By: Thao, Xai(Plaintiff))

Request - Other (Req & Order re: Dismissal) filed.

Request - Other (Req & Order re: Dismissal) filed. (Filed By: Thao, Xai(Plaintiff))

Request - Other (Request for Dismissal of Class Action - Denied w/o prejudice) filed.

Request - Other (Request for Dismissal of Class Action - Denied w/o prejudice) filed. (Filed By: Thao, Xai(Plaintiff))

Amended Complaint (FIRST) filed.

Amended Complaint (FIRST) filed. (Filed By: Thao, Xai(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Thao, Xai(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed. (Filed By: Thao, Xai(Plaintiff))

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Thao, Xai(Plaintiff))

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Thao, Xai(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • Case Management Conference - Complex scheduled for 10/31/2014 at 11:00:00 AM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • Amended Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed. (Filed By: Thao, Xai(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Thao, Xai(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint (FIRST) filed. (Filed By: Thao, Xai(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Request - Other (Request for Dismissal of Class Action - Denied w/o prejudice) filed. (Filed By: Thao, Xai(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Request - Other (Req & Order re: Dismissal) filed. (Filed By: Thao, Xai(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Request - Other (Req & Order for Dismissal) submitted by Thao, Xai rejected on 07/07/2014 . (Filed By: Thao, Xai(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Thao, Xai(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Other (Order for Notice of Assignment to Department 35 for Complex Case Management Determination) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • Case Management Conference - Complex scheduled for 10/31/2014 at 11:00:00 AM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Thao, Xai(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 35 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • Designated a complex action on 02/04/2014 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Thao, Xai(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Thao, Xai(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 99 RANCH MARKET, INC., A CALIFONIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where TAWA SUPERMARKET is a litigant