This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/13/2017 at 19:05:34 (UTC).

William Zozaya vs. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/09/2009 William Zozaya filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7086

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Zozaya, William

Zozaya, Candace Sorenson

Defendants

Capital mortgage Corporation

Dallas, Willaim David

Wells Fargo Bank NA as trustee for the holders of the First Franklin Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-FF15

Home Loan Services, Inc.

Teeter, Gregory D.

Teeter, Gregory

First Franklin Financial

HSBC Mortgage Services Successor

Household Financial Corporation

Twardus, Lori

Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.

Series 2006-FF15

First Franklin Loans Services

Select Portfolio Servicing

Does 1 to 20

Quality Loan Service Corporation

Wells Fargo Bank NA as trustee for te holders of the First Franklin Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-FF15 mortgage pass-through certificates

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeff D. Tochterman

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph M Elguindy

Megan E Gruber

James H French

Stuart B Wolfe

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/26/2010 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/26/2010 08:30:00 AM published .

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Zozaya, Candace(Plaintiff); Zozaya, William(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Zozaya, Candace(Plaintiff); Zozaya, William(Plaintiff))

Motion to Strike (Portions of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint) filed.

Motion to Strike (Portions of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: First Franklin Financial(Defendant); Select Portfolio Servicing(Defendant))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Motion to Strike) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Motion to Strike) filed. (Filed By: First Franklin Financial(Defendant); Select Portfolio Servicing(Defendant))

Amended Complaint (3rd) filed.

Amended Complaint (3rd) filed. (Filed By: Zozaya, Candace(Plaintiff); Zozaya, William(Plaintiff))

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 08/26/2010 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 08/26/2010 08:30:00 AM .

Motion to Strike (Portions of Third Amended Complaint) filed.

Motion to Strike (Portions of Third Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: First Franklin Financial(Defendant); Home Loan Services, Inc.(Defendant); Select Portfolio Servicing(Defendant); Wells Fargo Bank NA as trustee for te holders of the First Franklin Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-FF15 mortgage pass-through certificates(Defendant))

Notice - Other (Re-Notice of Motion to Strike Portions of Third Amended Complaint) filed.

Notice - Other (Re-Notice of Motion to Strike Portions of Third Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: First Franklin Financial(Defendant); Home Loan Services, Inc.(Defendant); Select Portfolio Servicing(Defendant); Wells Fargo Bank NA as trustee for te holders of the First Franklin Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-FF15 mortgage pass-through certificates(Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion heard on 02/04/2011 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion heard on 02/04/2011 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for heard on 02/07/2011 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for heard on 02/07/2011 09:00:00 AM .

Demurrer (to Third Amended Complaint) filed.

Demurrer (to Third Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Capital Mortgage Corporation(Defendant); Teeter, Gregory(Defendant))

Notice of Ruling (on Motion to Strike Portions of Third Amended Complaint) filed.

Notice of Ruling (on Motion to Strike Portions of Third Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: First Franklin Financial(Defendant); First Franklin Loans Services(Defendant); Home Loan Services, Inc.(Defendant); Select Portfolio Servicing(Defendant); Wells Fargo Bank NA as trustee for te holders of the First Franklin Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-FF15 mortgage pass-through certificates(Defendant))

Notice of Ruling (on Motion to Strike Portions of Third Amended Complaint) filed.

Notice of Ruling (on Motion to Strike Portions of Third Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: First Franklin Financial(Defendant); First Franklin Loans Services(Defendant); Home Loan Services, Inc.(Defendant); Select Portfolio Servicing(Defendant); Wells Fargo Bank NA as trustee for te holders of the First Franklin Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-FF15 mortgage pass-through certificates(Defendant))

Notice of Ruling (on Motion by Plaintiffs to File Fourth Amended Complaint) filed.

Notice of Ruling (on Motion by Plaintiffs to File Fourth Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: First Franklin Financial(Defendant); First Franklin Loans Services(Defendant); Home Loan Services, Inc.(Defendant); Select Portfolio Servicing(Defendant); Wells Fargo Bank NA as trustee for te holders of the First Franklin Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-FF15 mortgage pass-through certificates(Defendant))

Ex Parte Application - Other (for dismissal) filed.

Ex Parte Application - Other (for dismissal) filed. (Filed By: Capital Mortgage Corporation(Defendant))

Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.

Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.

Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed.

Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed. (Filed By: Capital Mortgage Corporation(Defendant); Teeter, Gregory(Defendant))

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2011
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2011
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2011
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2011
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2011
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to File Amended Complaint - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2010
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 45; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2010
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2010
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2010
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2010
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
90 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Select Portfolio Servicing(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Strike (Portions of Plaintiffs' Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Select Portfolio Servicing(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. (Filed By: Select Portfolio Servicing(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Demurrer filed. (Filed By: First Franklin Financial(Defendant); Home Loan Services, Inc.(Defendant); Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.(Defendant); Select Portfolio Servicing(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Order from United States District Court: Eastern District of California

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed. (Filed By: First Franklin Financial(Defendant); Home Loan Services, Inc.(Defendant); Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.(Defendant); Select Portfolio Servicing(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Zozaya, Candace(Plaintiff); Zozaya, William(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2009
  • Case assigned to Department 45 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Zozaya, Candace(Plaintiff); Zozaya, William(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Zozaya, Candace(Plaintiff); Zozaya, William(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less