Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/08/2017 at 13:03:03 (UTC).

WILLIAM COOPER. ET AL VS. DUNMORE HOMES. INC.. ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/22/2003 WILLIAM COOPER filed an Other lawsuit against DUNMORE HOMES INC. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6991

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2003

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Martinez, Richard J. & Sandra M.

Enakya, Poteesa & Makini

Herrera, Herra

Guillory, Sharron B.

Robinson, Lavonne E.

Banh, Sanh Xugen

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Pacific Wallborad Services

Do, Hai Thi

Fireplace Technologies, Inc

Ising Construction Co.

B&B Construction

Myers Baker & Associates

Kiwi Construction

H & M Roofing Inc

Cross Defendants

Pederson And Ising Construction

PAC International Eletric

Fischer Tile & Marble

Fireplace Technologies, Inc

Ising Construction Co.

Hardware Headquarters

B&B Construction

Myers Baker & Associates

General Eletric

Kiwi Construction

H & M Roofing Inc

Sherman Loehr Custom Tile Works

173 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

Drew M Johnson

Jordan A Rodman

Kyle W Memmott

W. Stuart Home, III

Other Attorneys

Michael F Keddy

Amanda J McKechnie

Brigitte M Mayo

Bob Sims

Frank M Radoslovich

Jon A Van Woerkom

Amanda R Lowe

Jerry M Duncan

I Hooshie Broomand

Matthew Salazar

Patricia A Sisemore

Donald D Harmata

Robin J Smith

Melissa Wood Eisenberg

J Scott Donald

John V O'Meara

26 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

CMP Packet

CMP Packet

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 01/10/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 01/10/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Request for Dismissal With Prejudice - Cause of Actions: filed.

Request for Dismissal With Prejudice - Cause of Actions: filed. (Filed By: Dunmore Homes Inc(Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program heard on 01/10/2008 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program heard on 01/10/2008 08:30:00 AM .

Returned Document Form - [Re: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof Of Service]

Returned Document Form - [Re: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof Of Service]

Dismissal entered 1/8/08

Dismissal entered 1/8/08

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Dunmore Homes Inc(Defendant))

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program; Department: 44; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program; Department: 44; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2006
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program; Department: 44; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2006
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Trial; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2006
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference; Department: 59; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2006
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions - Civil Special Sets; Department: 59; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2006
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program; Department: 44; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2006
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference; Department: 59; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2006
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions - Civil Special Sets; Department: 59; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2006
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
255 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2007
  • Beverly, Alisa added as a Plaintiff effective 07/11/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2007
  • Bennett, Catherine D. added as a Plaintiff effective 07/11/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2007
  • Banks, Jackie R. added as a Plaintiff effective 07/11/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2007
  • Banh, Sanh Xugen added as a Plaintiff effective 07/11/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2007
  • Banayat, Danilo P & Georgia P added as a Plaintiff effective 07/11/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2007
  • Averia, Ireneo V. added as a Plaintiff effective 07/11/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2007
  • Anderson, Howard W. added as a Plaintiff effective 07/11/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2007
  • Ancheta, Ray & Michelle added as a Plaintiff effective 07/11/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2007
  • ANASTASIOW, GEORGE J added as a Plaintiff effective 07/11/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2007
  • Aliali, Aiyub added as a Plaintiff effective 07/11/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pacific Wallborad Services is a litigant

Latest cases where Myers Baker & Associates is a litigant

Latest cases where Kiwi Construction is a litigant

Latest cases where FIREPLACE TECHNOLOGIES is a litigant