This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/02/2017 at 16:34:55 (UTC).

WALI SARWARI ET AL VS BEAZER HOMES HOLDINGS CORP

Case Summary

On 12/20/2006 WALI SARWARI filed an Other lawsuit against BEAZER HOMES HOLDINGS CORP. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5452

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lee, Warren

Haywood McPhearson, Angela R.

Morris, Wayne A.

Stokley, Melanie

Thomas H Du Vaul Trustee

Chang, Paul

Cross Defendants

Dynamic Roofing Company Inc

Does 1-500

G & E Landscaping

Jeld Wen Inc

Hardware Headquarters

Tozier Glass & Screen Inc

Anderson Truss Company

Wood Construction Company Inc

Ruscon Incorporated

Energetic Painting & Drywall

SMC Cabinets

Color Core Inc

Northwest Door

Capitol Wholesale Electric Co Inc

90 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Megan M Chodzko

Cross Defendant Attorneys

Randi L Fujimoto

Richard N Sieving

Robert N Paige

Robert M Thompson

Darryl M Yee

Other Attorneys

Katie M Esclamado

Brigitte M Mayo

Kevin J. Gillispie

Susan F Leonard

Susan H Rapp

Karin Landry

James Han

Jordan A Rodman

Patricia A Sisemore

Paul B Walsh

Russ J Wunderli

Thomas W Purtell

William J Schmidt

William B Rowell

20 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 06/19/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 06/19/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/14/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/14/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/28/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/28/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 09/24/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 09/24/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Stipulation to Set Aside Default of Sacramento A-1 Door

Stipulation to Set Aside Default of Sacramento A-1 Door

Notice of Entry - Other filed.

Notice of Entry - Other filed. (Filed By: Grand Floor Designs Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Stipulation and Order to set Aside Default Against Metropolitan Interior Designs, Inc.

Stipulation and Order to set Aside Default Against Metropolitan Interior Designs, Inc.

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Energetic Painting & Drywall(Cross - Defendant))

Dismissal entered as requested

Dismissal entered as requested

Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.

Notice of Change of Firm Name filed. (Filed By: Sacramento Insulation Contractors(Cross - Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Aldrene M Du Vaul Trustee(Plaintiff); Chang, Paul(Plaintiff); Chu, Lindsay(Plaintiff); De Castro, Vanessa(Plaintiff); Del Monte, Aaron(Plaintiff); Del Monte, Sherry(Plaintiff); Dixon, Jacqueline(Plaintiff); Dropmann, Ekkehard(Plaintiff); Du Vaul Family Trust(Plaintiff); Gibson, Carsella(Plaintiff); Gibson, Rydell(Plaintiff); Haywood McPhearson, Angela(Plaintiff); Homeowners(Plaintiff); Kesthely, Louis(Plaintiff); Kesthely, Nancy(Plaintiff); Lee, Warren(Plaintiff); Linde, Jeffrey(Plaintiff); Linde, Julie(Plaintiff); Llacuna, Betty(Plaintiff); Llacuna, Dwight(Plaintiff))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Jeld Wen Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Declaration - Other (Gregory G Dahl in support of application for good faith settlement) filed.

Declaration - Other (Gregory G Dahl in support of application for good faith settlement) filed. (Filed By: Pacific Coast Building Products(Cross - Defendant))

Order Determining Good Faith Settlement of Cross Defendant Sacramento Insulation Contractors

Order Determining Good Faith Settlement of Cross Defendant Sacramento Insulation Contractors

Notice of Entry - Other (of order granting application for determination of good faith settlement) filed.

Notice of Entry - Other (of order granting application for determination of good faith settlement) filed. (Filed By: Pacific Coast Building Products(Cross - Defendant))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Pinnacle Construction Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Recommendation and Order Allowing Execution of Settlement Agreement by Wallboard & Paint, Inc.'s Attorney of Record

Recommendation and Order Allowing Execution of Settlement Agreement by Wallboard & Paint, Inc.'s Attorney of Record

Attorneys Compliance Statement filed.

Attorneys Compliance Statement filed. (Filed By: Jeld Wen Inc(Cross - Defendant))

280 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program; Department: 39; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
518 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Mayo, Brigitte(Attorney))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2007
  • Mayo, Brigitte M added as a Attorney effective 11/20/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Dynamic Roofing & Wallboard & Paint(Cross - Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2007
  • Dynamic Roofing & Wallboard & Paint added as a Cross - Defendant effective 11/19/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation to Set Aside Default and Order Thereon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: Sonoran Roofing Inc(Cross - Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2007
  • Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other filed. (Filed By: Sonoran Roofing Inc(Cross - Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2007
  • Sonoran Roofing Inc added as a Cross - Defendant effective 11/14/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation to Set Aside Default of Sacramento A-1 Door

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • CMP Packet

    Read MoreRead Less