Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/16/2017 at 21:33:32 (UTC).

Volt Management Corp LLC vs. Kathleen Zunino

Case Summary

On 11/26/2014 Volt Management Corp LLC filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Kathleen Zunino. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2164

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

Volt Management Corp LLC

Respondent

Zunino, Kathleen

Interested Parties

Labor Commissioner, State of California

Department of Industrial Relations Division of Labor Standards Enforcement

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Matthew J Ruggles

Respondent Attorney

David D Cross

 

Court Documents

Appeal on the Award of Labor Comm filed.

Appeal on the Award of Labor Comm filed. (Filed By: Volt Management Corp LLC(Appellant))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Volt Management Corp LLC(Appellant))

Notice - Other (of Posting of Undertaking Regarding Appeal) filed.

Notice - Other (of Posting of Undertaking Regarding Appeal) filed. (Filed By: Volt Management Corp LLC(Appellant))

Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.

Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed. (Filed By: Volt Management Corp LLC(Appellant))

Civil Trial Assignment - Labor Commission Appeal - Civil Trial Assignment scheduled for 02/13/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Hearing has been generated .

Civil Trial Assignment - Labor Commission Appeal - Civil Trial Assignment scheduled for 02/13/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Hearing has been generated .

Notice - Other (Notice of Representation of Resopondent) filed.

Notice - Other (Notice of Representation of Resopondent) filed. (Filed By: Zunino, Kathleen(Respondent))

Trial Brief filed.

Trial Brief filed. (Filed By: Cross, David(Attorney))

Trial Brief filed.

Trial Brief filed. (Filed By: Volt Management Corp LLC(Appellant))

Minutes finalized for Civil Trial Assignment - Labor Commission Appeal - Civil Trial Assignment heard on 02/13/2015 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Civil Trial Assignment - Labor Commission Appeal - Civil Trial Assignment heard on 02/13/2015 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Civil Short Cause Court Trial - Civil Trial heard on 02/13/2015 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Civil Short Cause Court Trial - Civil Trial heard on 02/13/2015 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for heard on 02/18/2015 10:42:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for heard on 02/18/2015 10:42:00 AM .

Notice of Entry - Other (Notice of Entry of Order) filed.

Notice of Entry - Other (Notice of Entry of Order) filed. (Filed By: Volt Management Corp LLC(Appellant))

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Volt Management Corp LLC(Appellant))

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Volt Management Corp LLC(Appellant))

Order - Other (Order for Release of Labor Commissioner Deposit) filed.

Order - Other (Order for Release of Labor Commissioner Deposit) filed. (Filed By: Volt Management Corp LLC(Appellant))

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Civil Short Cause Court Trial - Civil Trial; Department: 30; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Civil Trial Assignment - Labor Commission Appeal - Civil Trial Assignment; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Other (Order for Release of Labor Commissioner Deposit) filed. (Filed By: Volt Management Corp LLC(Appellant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Volt Management Corp LLC(Appellant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Volt Management Corp LLC(Appellant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry - Other (Notice of Entry of Order) filed. (Filed By: Volt Management Corp LLC(Appellant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for heard on 02/18/2015 10:42:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Civil Short Cause Court Trial - Civil Trial heard on 02/13/2015 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Civil Trial Assignment - Labor Commission Appeal - Civil Trial Assignment heard on 02/13/2015 08:30:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • This case is reassigned to department 30 for short cause trial..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • Civil Short Cause Court Trial - Civil Trial scheduled for 02/13/2015 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 30 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Hearing has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Trial Brief filed. (Filed By: Volt Management Corp LLC(Appellant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Trial Brief filed. (Filed By: Cross, David(Attorney))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (Notice of Representation of Resopondent) filed. (Filed By: Zunino, Kathleen(Respondent))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Trial Assignment - Labor Commission Appeal - Civil Trial Assignment scheduled for 02/13/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Hearing has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 47 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed. (Filed By: Volt Management Corp LLC(Appellant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (of Posting of Undertaking Regarding Appeal) filed. (Filed By: Volt Management Corp LLC(Appellant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Volt Management Corp LLC(Appellant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Appeal on the Award of Labor Comm filed. (Filed By: Volt Management Corp LLC(Appellant))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VOLT MANAGEMENT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Department of Industrial Relations is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CROSS, DAVID D.