This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/31/2017 at 18:12:38 (UTC).

VICTOR OSBORNE ET AL VS KAISER PERMANENTA MEDICAL CENTER

Case Summary

On 09/13/2006 VICTOR OSBORNE filed an Other lawsuit against KAISER PERMANENTA MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3886

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wilson Jr, Jimmie

Hampton, Eithyl

Osborne, Victor

Reed, Lamont

Young, Alex

Kumar, Bijay

Taylor, Brenda

Pendygraft-Hampton, Christina

Gilliam, Vernon

Wise, Damon

Bragg, Kimberly

Derrico, Damon

Terrell, Andre

Defendants

Kaiser Foundation Hospitals

Kaiser permanente

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel H. Qualls

Defendant Attorney

William D Bishop, Jr

 

Court Documents

Returned Document (Notice of Entry of Dismissal)

Returned Document (Notice of Entry of Dismissal)

Points and Authorities filed.

Points and Authorities filed. (Filed By: Osborne, Victor(Plaintiff))

Motion to Vacate (request for dismissal without prejudice) filed.

Motion to Vacate (request for dismissal without prejudice) filed. (Filed By: Osborne, Victor(Plaintiff))

Points and Authorities filed.

Points and Authorities filed. (Filed By: Wilson, Jimmie(Plaintiff))

Application - Other (for admission of Grant Morris to the bar pro hac vice) filed.

Application - Other (for admission of Grant Morris to the bar pro hac vice) filed. (Filed By: Bragg, Kimberly(Plaintiff); Derrico, Damon(Plaintiff); Gilliam, Vernon(Plaintiff); Hampton, Eithyl(Plaintiff); Kumar, Bijay(Plaintiff); Osborne, Victor(Plaintiff); Pendygraft-Hampton, Christina(Plaintiff); Reed, Lamont(Plaintiff); Taylor, Brenda(Plaintiff); Terrell, Andre(Plaintiff); Wilson, Jimmie(Plaintiff); Wise, Damon(Plaintiff); Young, Alex(Plaintiff))

Opposition (to application of David Sanford to the bar of this court pro hac vice) filed.

Opposition (to application of David Sanford to the bar of this court pro hac vice) filed. (Filed By: Wilson, Jimmie(Plaintiff))

Opposition (to application of David Sanford to the bar of this court pro hac vice) filed.

Opposition (to application of David Sanford to the bar of this court pro hac vice) filed. (Filed By: Osborne, Victor(Plaintiff))

Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 03/06/2008 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 03/06/2008 09:00:00 AM .

Proof of Service filed.

Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: Wilson, Jimmie(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service filed.

Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: Wilson, Jimmie(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service filed.

Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: Wilson, Jimmie(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service filed.

Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: Wilson, Jimmie(Plaintiff))

Opposition to Noticed Motion (vacate dismissal) filed.

Opposition to Noticed Motion (vacate dismissal) filed. (Filed By: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals(Defendant))

Proof of Service filed.

Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals(Defendant))

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Wilson, Jimmie(Plaintiff))

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Wilson, Jimmie(Plaintiff))

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Wilson, Jimmie(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (Robin G Workman in opposition to motions to vacate dismissal of case) filed.

Declaration - Other (Robin G Workman in opposition to motions to vacate dismissal of case) filed. (Filed By: Bragg, Kimberly(Plaintiff); Derrico, Damon(Plaintiff); Gilliam, Vernon(Plaintiff); Hampton, Eithyl(Plaintiff); Kumar, Bijay(Plaintiff); Pendygraft-Hampton, Christina(Plaintiff); Reed, Lamont(Plaintiff); Taylor, Brenda(Plaintiff); Terrell, Andre(Plaintiff); Wise, Damon(Plaintiff); Young, Alex(Plaintiff))

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Trial Setting Conference - Trial Setting Conference; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 44; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2007
  • Osborne, Victor added as a Plaintiff effective 09/13/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2007
  • Kumar, Bijay added as a Plaintiff effective 09/13/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2007
  • Hampton, Eithyl added as a Plaintiff effective 09/13/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2007
  • Gilliam, Vernon added as a Plaintiff effective 09/13/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2007
  • Derrico, Damon added as a Plaintiff effective 09/13/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2007
  • Bragg, Kimberly added as a Plaintiff effective 09/13/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Opposition filed. (Filed By: Wilson, Jimmie(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (of Plaintiff Jimmie Wilson Opposition to Motion for Dismissal) filed. (Filed By: Wilson, Jimmie(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2007
  • Wilson, Jimmie Jr added as a Plaintiff effective 12/10/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2007
  • Osborne, Victor added as a Plaintiff effective 11/30/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less