Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/15/2017 at 13:19:18 (UTC).

Victor Hakopian vs. City of Sacramento

Case Summary

On 05/13/2014 Victor Hakopian filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Sacramento. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3530

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hakopian, Victor

Defendants

City of Sacramento

County of Sacramento

Does 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William E. Lombardini

Nathan C Long

Defendant Attorneys

James Sanchez

Katherine E Underwood

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Hakopian, Victor(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 03/26/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 03/26/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Hakopian, Victor(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Hakopian, Victor(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Hakopian, Victor(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Defendant))

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Hakopian, Victor(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Hakopian, Victor(Plaintiff))

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed.

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Defendant))

Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed.

Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (of Elizabeth A Hawkins in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Elizabeth A Hawkins in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings) filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Defendant))

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Cause of Actions: (Cause Of Action For General Negligence ONLY) filed.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Cause of Actions: (Cause Of Action For General Negligence ONLY) filed. (Filed By: Hakopian, Victor(Plaintiff))

Correspondence (letter confirming dropping of 12/18/14 JOP) filed.

Correspondence (letter confirming dropping of 12/18/14 JOP) filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Hakopian, Victor(Plaintiff))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Defendant))

Notice of Unavailability of Counsel filed.

Notice of Unavailability of Counsel filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Defendant))

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed.

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed. (Filed By: Hakopian, Victor(Plaintiff))

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2014
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/20/2017 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Unavailability of Counsel filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed. (Filed By: Hakopian, Victor(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Unavailability of Counsel filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Mediation Statement filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Hakopian, Victor(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Correspondence (letter confirming dropping of 12/18/14 JOP) filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2014
  • Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Hakopian, Victor(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Hakopian, Victor(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Hakopian, Victor(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 03/26/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 36 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 05/14/2014 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Hakopian, Victor(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Hakopian, Victor(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where City of Sacramento is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Sanchez