This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/20/2017 at 01:11:30 (UTC).

Vickiann Tapia vs. Thyssen Krupp Elevator Company

Case Summary

On 12/09/2015 Vickiann Tapia filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Thyssen Krupp Elevator Company. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7635

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tapia, Vickiann

Claimant

State Compensation Insurance Fund

Defendants

Does 1-10

Hines Real Property Management

Thyssen Krupp Elevator Company

Reit, Hines

ThyssenKrupp Elevator Corporation

Cross Defendants

Moes 1-50

Roes 1-50

Hines Interests Limited Partnership

Hines Reit 1515 S Street LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Geoffrey P Wong

Claimant Attorney

Young W Choi

Defendant Attorneys

Karen L Jacobsen

Christopher T Olsen

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 06/09/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 06/09/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Tapia, Vickiann(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Tapia, Vickiann(Plaintiff))

Statement of Venue filed.

Statement of Venue filed. (Filed By: Tapia, Vickiann(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/09/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 30 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/09/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 30 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: ThyssenKrupp Elevator Corporation(Defendant))

Cross-Complaint filed.

Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: Hines Real Property Management(Cross - Complainant); Reit, Hines(Cross - Complainant))

Summons (on Cross Complaint) filed.

Summons (on Cross Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Hines Real Property Management(Cross - Complainant); Reit, Hines(Cross - Complainant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Tapia, Vickiann(Plaintiff))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: ThyssenKrupp Elevator Corporation(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Hines Real Property Management(Defendant); Reit, Hines(Defendant))

Mediation Statement filed.

Mediation Statement filed. (Filed By: Hines Real Property Management(Defendant); Reit, Hines(Defendant))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: ThyssenKrupp Elevator Corporation(Cross - Defendant))

Cross-Complaint filed.

Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: ThyssenKrupp Elevator Corporation(Cross - Complainant))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: ThyssenKrupp Elevator Corporation(Cross - Complainant))

Notice of Lien filed.

Notice of Lien filed. (Filed By: State Compensation Insurance Fund(Lien Claimaint))

Stipulation and Order for Use of Private Alternative Dispute Resolution filed.

Stipulation and Order for Use of Private Alternative Dispute Resolution filed. (Filed By: Hines Real Property Management(Cross - Defendant); Reit, Hines(Cross - Defendant))

Stipulation and Order for Court Ordered Mediation filed.

Stipulation and Order for Court Ordered Mediation filed. (Filed By: Hines Reit 1515 S Street LP(Cross - Defendant))

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 30; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation and Order for Court Ordered Mediation filed. (Filed By: Hines Reit 1515 S Street LP(Cross - Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation and Order for Use of Private Alternative Dispute Resolution filed. (Filed By: Hines Real Property Management(Cross - Defendant); Reit, Hines(Cross - Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Lien filed. (Filed By: State Compensation Insurance Fund(Lien Claimaint))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • State Compensation Insurance Fund added as a Lien Claimaint effective 06/24/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 06/09/2016 08:30:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date no later than 60 days after the effective date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date within 60 days of the referral date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: ThyssenKrupp Elevator Corporation(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: ThyssenKrupp Elevator Corporation(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: Hines Real Property Management(Cross - Complainant); Reit, Hines(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • Roes 1-50 added as a Cross - Defendant effective 03/04/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: Hines Real Property Management(Defendant); Reit, Hines(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: ThyssenKrupp Elevator Corporation(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/09/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 30 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • Case assigned to Department 30 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 12/09/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Venue filed. (Filed By: Tapia, Vickiann(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Tapia, Vickiann(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Tapia, Vickiann(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less