This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/13/2017 at 23:25:55 (UTC).

Velocity Investments LLC vs. Geraldine E Hayes

Case Summary

On 11/05/2013 Velocity Investments LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Geraldine E Hayes. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4231

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendants

DOSE 1-10

HAYES, GERALDINE E

Hayes, Geraldine E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vijay S Desai

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed. (Filed By: Velocity Investments LLC(Plaintiff))

Declaration of Non Service filed.

Declaration of Non Service filed. (Filed By: Velocity Investments LLC(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Velocity Investments LLC(Plaintiff))

Statement of Venue filed.

Statement of Venue filed. (Filed By: Velocity Investments LLC(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Velocity Investments LLC(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Velocity Investments LLC(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2014
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2014
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • DocketComplaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed. (Filed By: Velocity Investments LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non Service filed. (Filed By: Velocity Investments LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Velocity Investments LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2013
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 12/02/2013 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Venue filed. (Filed By: Velocity Investments LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Velocity Investments LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Velocity Investments LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Velocity Investments LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF CURTIS O BARNES - VIJAY S. DESAI ESQ