This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 12/29/2017 at 06:46:58 (UTC).

Unique Builders Inc vs. David Knox

Case Summary

On 05/22/2017 Unique Builders Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against David Knox. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2834

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Unique Builders Inc

Defendants

Greenhead Investments Inc

David Knox and Gay Lynn Knox, as a marital community

Knox, David

Knox, Gay Lynn

Does 1 through 10

KS Plumbing Inc

Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, a Delaware corporation

Sierra Pacific Mortgage Company Inc

Cross Defendant

Roes 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric W Witt

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas G Trost

Anthony Eaton

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 11/30/2017 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 11/30/2017 08:30:00 AM published .

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Unique Builders Inc(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Knox, David(Defendant); Knox, Gay(Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 11/30/2017 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 11/30/2017 08:30:00 AM .

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Unique Builders Inc(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Unique Builders Inc(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Unique Builders Inc(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 11/30/2017 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 11/30/2017 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Notice of Pendency of Action filed.

Notice of Pendency of Action filed. (Filed By: Unique Builders Inc(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Unique Builders Inc(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Unique Builders Inc(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Unique Builders Inc(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Unique Builders Inc(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Unique Builders Inc(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Unique Builders Inc(Plaintiff))

Declaration of Non-Monetary Status filed.

Declaration of Non-Monetary Status filed. (Filed By: Sierra Pacific Mortgage Company Inc(Defendant))

Declaration of Non-Monetary Status filed.

Declaration of Non-Monetary Status filed. (Filed By: Greenhead Investments Inc(Defendant))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Knox, David(Defendant); Knox, Gay(Defendant))

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 39; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 11/30/2017 08:30:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketCase Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date no later than 60 days after the effective date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketCase Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date within 60 days of the referral date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 11/30/2017 08:30:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Knox, David(Defendant); Knox, Gay(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Unique Builders Inc(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (to Cross-Complaint of D. Knox) filed. (Filed By: Unique Builders Inc(Cross - Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Unique Builders Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Unique Builders Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Unique Builders Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Unique Builders Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Unique Builders Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Pendency of Action filed. (Filed By: Unique Builders Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 11/30/2017 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 05/23/2017 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Unique Builders Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Unique Builders Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Unique Builders Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREENHEAD INVESTMENTS, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SIERRA PACIFIC MORTGAGE COMPANY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WITT ERIC WILLIAM