Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/06/2017 at 06:16:19 (UTC).

TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE. ET AL VS. SPHERE DRAKE INS CO.ETAL

Case Summary

On 02/20/2003 TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE filed an Other lawsuit against SPHERE DRAKE INS CO ETAL. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0933

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2003

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Truck Insurance Exchange

Defendants

Transcontinental Insurance Company

Scottsdale Insurance Company

Travelers Casualty & Surety Company

First Financial Insurance Company

Firemans Fund Insurance Company

Mutual Services Casualty Insurance Company

Steadfast Insurance Company

General Security Insurance Company

Sphere Drake Insurance Company

US Fire Insurance Company

Financial Pacific Insurance Company

St Paul Insurance Company

North American Capacity Insurance Company

Commercial Union Insurance Company

Calfarm Insurance Company

Environmental & Casualty Insurance Company

Cross Defendants

Federated Mutual Insurance Company

Century Surety Company

Insurance Corporation of New York

33 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory R. De La Pena

Defendant Attorneys

Anthony L Cione

John H. Podesta

David W Gordon

Susan F Halman

Blaise S. Curet

Denis J Moriarty

William J Schmidt

W. Eric Blumhardt

Bradley M Zamczyk

Carl A. Yaeckel

Brandt L Wolkin

Dennis C Birkhimer

Cross Defendant Attorneys

Daniel P Costa

John Edward Peer

Wade M Hansard

Other Attorneys

Tyler G Olphin

Gregory D Abt

Michelle R Press

Kristi D Rothschild

 

Court Documents

Reply - Other (to Financial Pacific's response to Plaintiffs opposition to motion to dismiss) filed.

Reply - Other (to Financial Pacific's response to Plaintiffs opposition to motion to dismiss) filed. (Filed By: Truck Insurance Exchange(Cross - Defendant))

Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application

Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application

Declaration - Other (in support of ex parte application for OST) filed.

Declaration - Other (in support of ex parte application for OST) filed. (Filed By: Mid Century Insurance Company(Plaintiff); Truck Insurance Exchange(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (Gregory de la Pena in support of application for OST) filed.

Declaration - Other (Gregory de la Pena in support of application for OST) filed. (Filed By: Mid Century Insurance Company(Plaintiff); Truck Insurance Exchange(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Truck Insurance Exchange(Plaintiff))

Dismissal entered as requested.

Dismissal entered as requested.

Minutes finalized for Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment heard on 01/16/2008 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment heard on 01/16/2008 08:30:00 AM .

Trial Brief filed.

Trial Brief filed. (Filed By: Financial Pacific Insurance Company(Defendant))

Minutes finalized for heard on 01/24/2008 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for heard on 01/24/2008 09:00:00 AM .

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Mid Century Insurance Company(Plaintiff); Truck Insurance Exchange(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party submitted by Truck Insurance Exchange rejected on 06/16/2008 .

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party submitted by Truck Insurance Exchange rejected on 06/16/2008 . (Filed By: Truck Insurance Exchange(Plaintiff))

Objection (to Evidence in Support of Financial Pacific's Motion for Order Taxing Costs in Revised Memorandum of Costs) filed.

Objection (to Evidence in Support of Financial Pacific's Motion for Order Taxing Costs in Revised Memorandum of Costs) filed. (Filed By: Mid Century Insurance Company(Plaintiff); Truck Insurance Exchange(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service filed.

Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: Mid Century Insurance Company(Plaintiff); Truck Insurance Exchange(Plaintiff))

Substitution of Attorney filed.

Substitution of Attorney filed. (Filed By: Financial Pacific Insurance Company(Defendant))

3DCA Order Regarding Mediation

3DCA Order Regarding Mediation

Notice to Reporters Prepared

Notice to Reporters Prepared

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor filed.

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor filed. (Filed By: Truck Insurance Exchange(Plaintiff))

Minutes finalized for Order of Examination - OX Calendar heard on 03/03/2009 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Order of Examination - OX Calendar heard on 03/03/2009 08:30:00 AM .

89 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order of Examination - OX Calendar; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 24; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion; Department: 47; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:30 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:30 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 1:30 PM; Event Type: Civil Short Cause Court Trial - Civil Trial; Department: 57; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Civil Settlement Conference - Day of Trial - Civil Settlement Conference; Department: 59; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions - Civil Special Sets; Department: 47; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment; Department: 24; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
222 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2007
  • Firemans Fund Insurance Company added as a Defendant effective 02/20/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2007
  • Financial Pacific Insurance Company added as a Defendant effective 02/20/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2007
  • Fidelity Guaranty Insurance Company added as a Defendant effective 02/20/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2007
  • Credit General Insurance Company added as a Defendant effective 02/20/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2007
  • Commercial Union Insurance Company added as a Defendant effective 02/20/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2007
  • Citation Insurance Company added as a Defendant effective 02/20/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2007
  • Calfarm Insurance Company added as a Defendant effective 02/20/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2007
  • Assurance Company of America added as a Defendant effective 02/20/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2007
  • American International Specialty Lines Insurance Company added as a Defendant effective 02/20/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2007
  • Admiral Insurance Company added as a Defendant effective 02/20/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First Financial Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where TRANSCONTINENTAL INSURANCE CO is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITRIN AUTO AND HOME INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Onebeacon America Insurance Company On Behalf Of is a litigant