This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/13/2017 at 07:31:13 (UTC).

Tri-Tool Inc vs. Copeland Properties Three LP

Case Summary

On 07/27/2009 Tri-Tool Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Copeland Properties Three LP. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4045

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tri-Tool Inc

Defendants

Charles Schwab FBO Janet I

Melvyn & Ruth Ross Revocable Trust

David Ziilch Trust

Hayes, Sandra

Copeland, Charles P.

Schwab, Chales

Reid, Albert

Copeland Properties Three LP

Bricker, Neal

Weed, Timothy C.

Ihde, Janet

Does 1-20

Taber Family Trust

Ross, Ruth

Lowe, Carol P.

Copeland, Donald E.

Eure, WW

Tozier, Steven

Franklin, Lillian

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rollie A. Peterson

Defendant Attorneys

Robert H Ziprick

John E Bowerbank

Scott D Showler

John H Stephens

Marshall Brubacher

Other Attorneys

Chad S Tapp

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Motion for Leave to Intervene - PJ Law and Motion set on 06/25/2010 09:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion for Leave to Intervene - PJ Law and Motion set on 06/25/2010 09:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 07/15/2010 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 07/15/2010 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion set on 01/12/2011 09:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion set on 01/12/2011 09:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion for Change of Venue - PJ Law and Motion set on 11/15/2016 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion for Change of Venue - PJ Law and Motion set on 11/15/2016 09:30:00 AM published .

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Tri-Tool Inc(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Tri-Tool Inc(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Tri-Tool Inc(Plaintiff))

Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.

Notice of Change of Firm Name filed. (Filed By: Tri-Tool Inc(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Tri-Tool Inc(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Tri-Tool Inc(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Tri-Tool Inc(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Copeland Properties Three LP(Defendant); Copeland, Charles(Defendant); Copeland, Donald(Defendant))

Stipulation and Order

Stipulation and Order

Amended Complaint (First Amended Complaint) filed.

Amended Complaint (First Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Tri-Tool Inc(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 07/15/2010 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 07/15/2010 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Motion - Other (for leave of court to intervene) submitted by Copeland Properties Three LP rejected on 05/26/2010 .

Motion - Other (for leave of court to intervene) submitted by Copeland Properties Three LP rejected on 05/26/2010 . (Filed By: Copeland Properties Three LP(Defendant))

Motion - Other filed.

Motion - Other filed. (Filed By: Jamal LLC(Interpleader))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. (Filed By: Jamal LLC(Interpleader))

370 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2016
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 9:30 AM; Event Type: Motion for Change of Venue - PJ Law and Motion; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
503 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed. (Filed By: Copeland Properties Three LP(Defendant); Copeland, Charles(Defendant); Copeland, Donald(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Tri-Tool Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Tri-Tool Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Tri-Tool Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name filed. (Filed By: Tri-Tool Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2009
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Tri-Tool Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Tri-Tool Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Tri-Tool Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2009
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 07/27/2009 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAPP, CHAD S.