This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/10/2017 at 16:36:23 (UTC).

Towne Development of Sacramento Inc vs. National Surety Corporation

Case Summary

On 11/21/2012 Towne Development of Sacramento Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against National Surety Corporation. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5855

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Towne Development of Sacramento Inc

Defendants

Underwriters at Lloyds

Does 1-100

Nic Insurance Company

Allied Mutual Insurance Company

CNA Insurance Company

Financial Pacific Insurance Company

Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company RRG

Transportation Insurance Company

National Fire & Marine Insurance Company

National Surety Corporation

Northern American Capacity Insurance

Gemini Insurance Co

Valley Forge Insurance Company

Zurich North America

Allianz Global Risk US Insurance Company

Lexington Insurance Company

Assurance Company of America

American International Specialty

Maryland Casualty Company

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David A Frenznick

Defendant Attorneys

Michele O Blais

Kevin M Haithcox

Katherine K Liner

Blaise S. Curet

Other Attorneys

Ramiro Morales

George D Yaron

James L Wraith

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 05/23/2013 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 05/23/2013 08:30:00 AM published .

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Towne Development of Sacramento Inc(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Towne Development of Sacramento Inc(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (Notice of Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (Notice of Case Management Conference) filed.

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Towne Development of Sacramento Inc(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Assurance Company of America(Defendant))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Maryland Casualty Company(Defendant))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Clarendon National Insurance Company(Defendant))

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Towne Development of Sacramento Inc(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Lexington Insurance Company(Defendant))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Gemini Insurance Co(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Lexington Insurance Company(Defendant))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Western World Insurance Company(Defendant))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Allianz Global Risk US Insurance Company(Defendant))

Complaint - Doe Amendment filed.

Complaint - Doe Amendment filed. (Filed By: Towne Development of Sacramento Inc(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Illinois Union Insurance Company(Defendant))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company RRG(Defendant))

Mediation Statement filed.

Mediation Statement filed. (Filed By: Allianz Global Risk US Insurance Company(Defendant))

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2013
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 39; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • Case disposed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed. (Filed By: Towne Development of Sacramento Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Towne Development of Sacramento Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Towne Development of Sacramento Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Towne Development of Sacramento Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Towne Development of Sacramento Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2013
  • Case disposed with disposition of .

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Towne Development of Sacramento Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: Clarendon National Insurance Company(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: Maryland Casualty Company(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: Assurance Company of America(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • Case assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 01/14/2013 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Towne Development of Sacramento Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Other (Notice of Case Management Conference) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Towne Development of Sacramento Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Towne Development of Sacramento Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NIC INSURANCE COMPANY AKA is a litigant

Latest cases where Towne Development of Sacramento, Inc., et al. is a litigant

Latest cases where PROBUILDERS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY RRG is a litigant

Latest cases where ASSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA is a litigant