Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/04/2017 at 03:33:52 (UTC).

THOMAS POPPIN. ET AL. VS. U.S. HOME CORPORATION. ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/12/2007 THOMAS POPPIN filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against U S HOME CORPORATION. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1114

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sayavong, Mona

Kavr, Jaspal

Poppin, Kim

Rios, Linda

Huynh, Tanya

Quach, Dinh

Criner, Joseph M.

Singh, Parwinder

Moulton, Richard D.

Thompson, Sandra

Blanchard, Lyrae

Defendants

Jim Silva Concrete, Inc

Ikes Landscaping

Vasiliou Construction

Wags Innovation Inc

Wes Robinson Enterprises

Hock, Gregory Wayne

US Home Corporation

H & M Roofing Inc

Cross Defendant

Jeld Wen Inc

271 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jerod A Marsalli

Defendant Attorney

Anne E Connelly

Other Attorneys

James W Doran

LeeAnn E Whitmore

Benjamin W Blaisdell

James L Shea

Drew M Johnson

Van De Poel, Levy & Allen LLP

Travis N Barrick

Karin Landry

Amanda J McKechnie

Edward M Lai

Clement L Glynn

Ilene Isert-Kott

Victoria L Katchis

Mark P O'Dea

Ross R Nott

Donald D Harmata

Terilynn Perez

Tania H Colderbank

29 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/06/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/06/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 06/19/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 06/19/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/21/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/21/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/28/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/28/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/26/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/26/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/27/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/27/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 09/17/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 09/17/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 10/22/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 10/22/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 01/14/2010 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 01/14/2010 08:30:00 AM published .

Mediation Statement filed.

Mediation Statement filed.

Complaint - Doe Amendment filed.

Complaint - Doe Amendment filed. (Filed By: Poppin, Thomas(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Poppin, Kim(Plaintiff); Poppin, Thomas(Plaintiff))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Western Shower Door Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Sierra Grading Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Determination of Good Faith Settlement heard on 10/09/2008 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Determination of Good Faith Settlement heard on 10/09/2008 09:00:00 AM .

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: U.S. Home Corporation(Cross - Complainant))

Declaration - Other (Ronald G Whitehead in support of motion for determination of good faith settlement) filed.

Declaration - Other (Ronald G Whitehead in support of motion for determination of good faith settlement) filed. (Filed By: Northern California Inland Materials Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Notice of Entry - Other (Notice of Entry of Order Re Good Faith Determination) filed.

Notice of Entry - Other (Notice of Entry of Order Re Good Faith Determination) filed. (Filed By: Joe Catello Tile(Cross - Defendant))

411 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2010
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program; Department: 45; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 45; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
994 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2007
  • Poppin, Kim added as a Plaintiff effective 11/14/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2007
  • Poppin, Thomas added as a Plaintiff effective 11/14/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: US Home Corporation(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2007
  • US Home Corporation added as a Defendant effective 11/14/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed. (Filed By: Poppin, Kim(Plaintiff); Poppin, Thomas(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Poppin, Kim(Plaintiff); Poppin, Thomas(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2007
  • Nguyen, Kim Ba added as a Defendant effective 11/20/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2007
  • Poppin, Kim added as a Plaintiff effective 11/20/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2007
  • Poppin, Thomas added as a Plaintiff effective 11/20/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • CMP Packet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ikes Landscaping Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Wags Innovation Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Vasiliou Construction is a litigant

Latest cases where H & M Roofing is a litigant