This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/17/2017 at 14:14:22 (UTC).

Terence Lamar Wilburn vs. Garren Bratcher

Case Summary

On 02/20/2015 Terence Lamar Wilburn filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Garren Bratcher. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5441

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wilburn, Terence Lamar

Defendants

Bratcher, Garren

Chargin, G

City of Sacramento

County of Sacramento

Daniels, Bobby

Deputy Hester

Does 1-23

Gweon, Helena

Huang, Teresa

Jones, Scott R.

Patton, K

Ratcliffe, J

Sacramento County District Attorney

Sacramento County Sheriff's Department

Sacramento Police Department

Somers Jr, Samuel D.

Sood, S

West, Laura

Yee, Lawrence

1 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Wilburn, Terence(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Wilburn, Terence(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Wilburn, Terence(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/28/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/28/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed.

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed. (Filed By: Wilburn, Terence(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Wilburn, Terence(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Wilburn, Terence(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Wilburn, Terence(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Wilburn, Terence(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Wilburn, Terence(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Wilburn, Terence(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Wilburn, Terence(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Wilburn, Terence(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Wilburn, Terence(Plaintiff))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. (Filed By: County of Sacramento(Defendant); County of Sacramento(Defendant); Deputy Hester(Defendant); Huang, Teresa(Defendant); Jones, Scott(Defendant); Sacramento County District Attorney(Defendant); Sacramento County Sheriff's Department(Defendant); Sacramento County Sheriff's Department(Defendant); West, Laura(Defendant); Yee, Lawrence(Defendant))

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed.

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed. (Filed By: Chargin, G(Defendant); City of Sacramento(Defendant); Daniels, Bobby(Defendant); Patton, K(Defendant); Ratcliffe, J(Defendant); Somers, Samuel(Defendant); Sood, S(Defendant); Yepes, J(Defendant))

Opposition filed.

Opposition filed. (Filed By: Wilburn, Terence(Plaintiff))

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 05/28/2015 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 05/28/2015 02:00:00 PM .

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 05/28/2015 02:00:00 PM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Of Melvin Jeanmard RE: Diligence) filed. (Filed By: Wilburn, Terence(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed. (Filed By: County of Sacramento(Defendant); Huang, Teresa(Defendant); Jones, Scott(Defendant); Sacramento County District Attorney(Defendant); Sacramento County Sheriff's Department(Defendant); Yee, Lawrence(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Opposition filed. (Filed By: Wilburn, Terence(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP scheduled for 05/28/2015 at 02:00:00 PM in Department 53 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/28/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed. (Filed By: Chargin, G(Defendant); City of Sacramento(Defendant); Daniels, Bobby(Defendant); Patton, K(Defendant); Ratcliffe, J(Defendant); Somers, Samuel(Defendant); Sood, S(Defendant); Yepes, J(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. (Filed By: County of Sacramento(Defendant); County of Sacramento(Defendant); Deputy Hester(Defendant); Huang, Teresa(Defendant); Jones, Scott(Defendant); Sacramento County District Attorney(Defendant); Sacramento County Sheriff's Department(Defendant); Sacramento County Sheriff's Department(Defendant); West, Laura(Defendant); Yee, Lawrence(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing filed. (Filed By: County of Sacramento(Defendant); County of Sacramento(Defendant); Deputy Hester(Defendant); Huang, Teresa(Defendant); Jones, Scott(Defendant); Sacramento County District Attorney(Defendant); Sacramento County Sheriff's Department(Defendant); Sacramento County Sheriff's Department(Defendant); West, Laura(Defendant); Yee, Lawrence(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Wilburn, Terence(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Wilburn, Terence(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • Wilburn, Terence Lamar Application for Waiver granted in full on 02/23/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed. (Filed By: Wilburn, Terence(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/28/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • Case assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 02/23/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Wilburn, Terence(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Wilburn, Terence(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Wilburn, Terence(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less