This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/17/2017 at 18:10:07 (UTC).

Successor Agency to The Tustin Community Redevelopment Agency vs. Michael Cohen, Director of Finance

Case Summary

On 03/19/2015 Successor Agency to The Tustin Community Redevelopment Agency filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against Michael Cohen, Director of Finance. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2046

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

City of Tustin

Successor Agency to The Tustin Community Redevelopment Agency

Tustin Housing Authority

Respondents

Does 1 to 100

Michael Cohen, Director of Finance

Interested Parties

County of Orange

East Orange County Water District

Irvine Ranch Water District

Irvine Unified School District

Municipal Water District of Orange County

Orange County Cemetery District

Orange County Department of Education

Orange County Flood Control District

Orange County Parks

Orange County Sanitation District

Orange County Vector Control District

Orange County Water District

Rancho Santiago Community College District

Roes 101 to 125

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Anthony OBrien

Interested Party Attorneys

Jona C Arneson

Joel D Kuperberg

Other Attorneys

Brandford B Kuhn

 

Court Documents

Successor Agency to the Tustin Community Redevelopment Agency v. Michael Cohen - Order to Appear

Successor Agency to the Tustin Community Redevelopment Agency v. Michael Cohen - Order to Appear

Successor Agency to the Tustin Community Redevelopment Agency v. Michael Cohen - Writ

Successor Agency to the Tustin Community Redevelopment Agency v. Michael Cohen - Writ

Petition for Writ of Mandate filed.

Petition for Writ of Mandate filed. (Filed By: City of Tustin(Petitioner); Successor Agency to The Tustin Community Redevelopment Agency(Petitioner); Tustin Housing Authority(Petitioner))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: City of Tustin(Petitioner); Successor Agency to The Tustin Community Redevelopment Agency(Petitioner); Tustin Housing Authority(Petitioner))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: City of Tustin(Petitioner); Successor Agency to The Tustin Community Redevelopment Agency(Petitioner); Tustin Housing Authority(Petitioner))

Case initiation form printed .

Case initiation form printed .

Proof of Service (Notice And Acknowledgment Of Receipt) filed.

Proof of Service (Notice And Acknowledgment Of Receipt) filed. (Filed By: Successor Agency to The Tustin Community Redevelopment Agency(Petitioner))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Successor Agency to The Tustin Community Redevelopment Agency(Petitioner))

Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed.

Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed. (Filed By: Successor Agency to The Tustin Community Redevelopment Agency(Petitioner))

Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed.

Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed. (Filed By: Successor Agency to The Tustin Community Redevelopment Agency(Petitioner))

Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed.

Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed. (Filed By: Successor Agency to The Tustin Community Redevelopment Agency(Petitioner))

Notice - Other (of Representation/Response to Petition for Writ of Mandate) filed.

Notice - Other (of Representation/Response to Petition for Writ of Mandate) filed. (Filed By: East Orange County Water District(Real Party In Interest (Rpii)))

Notice - Other (of Representation/Response to Petition for Writ of Mandate) filed.

Notice - Other (of Representation/Response to Petition for Writ of Mandate) filed. (Filed By: Irvine Ranch Water District(Real Party In Interest (Rpii)))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Orange County Water District(Real Party In Interest (Rpii)))

Stipulation and Order (Re: Compliance With Issued Writ of Mandate) filed.

Stipulation and Order (Re: Compliance With Issued Writ of Mandate) filed. (Filed By: Orange County Water District(Real Party In Interest (Rpii)))

Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.

Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed. (Filed By: Successor Agency to The Tustin Community Redevelopment Agency(Petitioner))

Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.

Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed. (Filed By: Successor Agency to The Tustin Community Redevelopment Agency(Petitioner))

Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.

Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed. (Filed By: Successor Agency to The Tustin Community Redevelopment Agency(Petitioner))

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2016
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Petition for Writ of Mandate - Writ of Mandate; Department: 31; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Petition for Writ of Mandate - Writ of Mandate; Department: 31; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Return to Peremptory Writ of Mandate) filed. (Filed By: Michael Cohen, Director of Finance(Respondent))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry - Other (Peremptory Writ of Mandate) filed. (Filed By: Michael Cohen, Director of Finance(Respondent))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Original issued Premptory Writ of Mandate filed) filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry - Other (of Order) filed. (Filed By: Michael Cohen, Director of Finance(Respondent))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment filed. (Filed By: Michael Cohen, Director of Finance(Respondent))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Peremptory Writ of Mandate issued) filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • DocketJudgment entered .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment - by Court - After Trial filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed. (Filed By: Successor Agency to The Tustin Community Redevelopment Agency(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed. (Filed By: Successor Agency to The Tustin Community Redevelopment Agency(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed. (Filed By: Successor Agency to The Tustin Community Redevelopment Agency(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Successor Agency to The Tustin Community Redevelopment Agency(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service (Notice And Acknowledgment Of Receipt) filed. (Filed By: Successor Agency to The Tustin Community Redevelopment Agency(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 31 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: City of Tustin(Petitioner); Successor Agency to The Tustin Community Redevelopment Agency(Petitioner); Tustin Housing Authority(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: City of Tustin(Petitioner); Successor Agency to The Tustin Community Redevelopment Agency(Petitioner); Tustin Housing Authority(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate filed. (Filed By: City of Tustin(Petitioner); Successor Agency to The Tustin Community Redevelopment Agency(Petitioner); Tustin Housing Authority(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Orange County Vector Control District is a litigant

Latest cases where Orange County Cemetery District is a litigant

Latest cases where Municipal Water District of Orange County is a litigant

Latest cases where ORANGE COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION is a litigant