Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/16/2017 at 06:39:00 (UTC).

Steven Sanghera vs. Shooter Billiards LLC

Case Summary

On 09/11/2014 Steven Sanghera filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Shooter Billiards LLC. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8829

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sanghera, Steven

Defendants

Diamond Billards

Shooter Billiards LLC

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Sanghera, Steven(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Sanghera, Steven(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Sanghera, Steven(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 07/23/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 07/23/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed. (Filed By: Sanghera, Steven(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service filed.

Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: Sanghera, Steven(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: Sanghera, Steven(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 07/23/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed. (Filed By: Sanghera, Steven(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 07/23/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 09/12/2014 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Sanghera, Steven(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Sanghera, Steven(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Sanghera, Steven(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less